EP2513306 - C. HISTOLYTICUM RECOMBINANT COLLAGENASES AND METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abiel S.r.l. Via del Mare 3 91021 Campobello di Mazara TP / IT | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTUZZI, Federico Via Armellini 25 I-20161 Milano MI / IT | 02 /
CUTTITTA, Angela Piazza Niscemi 37 I-90146 Palermo PA / IT | 03 /
GHERSI, Giulio c/o Università degli Studi di Palermo Dip.to di Biologia Cellulare e dello Sviluppo Centro Interdep.le Biotecnologie Applicate Viale delle Scienze, Edificio 16 I-90128 Palermo PA / IT | 04 /
MAZZOLA, Salvatore Via Villa Giocosa 9 I-90146 Palermo PA / IT | 05 /
SALAMONE, Monica Via Schioppettieri 8 I-90133 Palermo PA / IT | 06 /
SEIDITA, Gregorio Via Portogallo 11 I-90146 Palermo PA / IT | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
BERTUZZI, Federico Via Armellini 25 I-20161 Milano MI / IT | ||
02 /
CUTTITTA, Angela Piazza Niscemi 37 I-90146 Palermo PA / IT | |||
03 /
GHERSI, Giulio c/o Università degli Studi di Palermo Dip.to di Biologia Cellulare e dello Sviluppo Centro Interdep.le Biotecnologie Applicate Viale delle Scienze Edificio 16 I-90128 Palermo PA / IT | |||
04 /
MAZZOLA, Salvatore Via Villa Giocosa 9 I-90146 Palermo PA / IT | |||
05 /
SALAMONE, Monica Via Schioppettieri 8 I-90133 Palermo PA / IT | |||
06 /
SEIDITA, Gregorio Via Portogallo 11 I-90146 Palermo PA / IT | Representative(s) | Predazzi, Valentina, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [2019/12] |
Former [2012/43] | Predazzi, Valentina, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma (RM) / IT | Application number, filing date | 10818077.9 | 15.12.2010 | [2019/12] | WO2010IB55840 | Priority number, date | IT2009RM00661 | 15.12.2009 Original published format: IT RM20090661 | [2011/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011073925 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2513306 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2513306 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N9/52, C12N9/64 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
C12N9/52 (EP,US);
C12N9/6491 (EP,US);
C12Y304/24003 (EP,US);
C07K2319/24 (EP,US);
C07K2319/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | C12N15/11 | ||
Former IPC [2011/32] | C12N1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | 11.06.2012 | ME | 11.06.2012 | Title | German: | C. HYSTOLITICUM REKOMBINANTE KOLLAGENASEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2018/26] | English: | C. HISTOLYTICUM RECOMBINANT COLLAGENASES AND METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2012/43] | French: | C. HYSTOLITICUM COLLAGÉNASES RECOMBINANTES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2018/26] |
Former [2012/43] | REKOMBINANTE C. HISTOLYTICUM-KOLLAGENASEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2012/43] | COLLAGÉNASES DE RECOMBINAISON DE C. HISTOLYTICUM ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CES DERNIÈRES | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 08.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 24.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2010 | AL | 20.03.2019 | AT | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | ES | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | IT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | LU | 15.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 15.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
NO | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO9400580 (TRIGEN INC [US], et al); | [XDY]WO2008100833 (AUXILIUM INT HOLDINGS INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO9400580 | US2008233614 |