EP2483698 - METHODS, DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR REMOTE WIND SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pentalum Technologies Ltd. 5 Oppenheimer Street Rabin Technology Park 76701 Rehovot / IL | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSADKA, Sagie 72 Moshav Meihar 76850 D.N. Emek Soreq 76850 / IL | 02 /
SELA, Nathan 73 Shimon Street 71700 Modi'in / IL | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [2015/28] |
Former [2012/32] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10818485.4 | 28.09.2010 | WO2010IB02434 | Priority number, date | US20090246174P | 28.09.2009 Original published format: US 246174 P | US20090285991P | 13.12.2009 Original published format: US 285991 P | US20100351976P | 07.06.2010 Original published format: US 351976 P | US20100352396P | 08.06.2010 Original published format: US 352396 P | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011036553 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2483698 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2483698 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/36, G01P5/26, G01S17/58 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
G01P5/26 (EP,US);
G01S17/18 (EP,US);
G01S17/58 (EP,US);
G01S17/87 (EP,US);
G01S17/95 (EP,US);
G01S7/4814 (EP,US);
G01S7/4817 (EP,US);
G01S7/486 (EP,US);
F05B2240/96 (EP,US);
F05B2260/80 (EP,US);
F05B2270/32 (EP,US);
F05B2270/8042 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | G01P3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEME FÜR ENTFERNTE WINDERFASSUNG | [2012/32] | English: | METHODS, DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR REMOTE WIND SENSING | [2012/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES DE DÉTECTION À DISTANCE DU VENT | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 16.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.10.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2010 | AL | 08.07.2015 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BE | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | HR | 08.07.2015 | IT | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | MK | 08.07.2015 | MT | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | PL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | SM | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | IE | 28.09.2015 | LU | 28.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | NO | 08.10.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
BG | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
BG | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
LU | 28.09.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 08.07.2015 | |
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004021875 (NORTHBY JAN ARWOOD [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0052] *; | [YD]US2005002013 (HARRIS MICHAEL [GB]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076] *; | [YD]US2009046289 (CALDWELL LOREN M [US], et al) [YD] 1,4,6,9,13-15 * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0137] *; | [YA]WO2005047908 (PHOTON CONTROL INC [CA], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0040] * [A] 1,11,12 | International search | [X]US2009046289 (CALDWELL LOREN M [US], et al); | [X]US2005002013 (HARRIS MICHAEL [GB]); | [X]US2006140764 (SMITH DAVID A [GB], et al); | [Y]US6313908 (MCGILL MATTHEW J [US], et al); | [Y]US6687036 (RIZA NABEEL AGHA [US]); | [Y]US2007124025 (SCHRAM CHRISTIAN [DE], et al); | [Y]US2009099702 (VYAS PARAG [DE], et al); | [A]US2003043364 (JAMIESON JAMES R [US], et al); | [A]US2008180691 (HAYS PAUL BYRON [US], et al); | [Y] - XIA ET AL, "Dual-beam incoherent cross-correlation spectroscopy", J.OPT.SOC.AM. A, vol. 12, no. 7, (199507), page 1571, 1575, URL: http://www.phys.ust.hk/penger/Publications/JOSAA_v12_1571.pdf, (20110126), XP008154948 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/JOSAA.12.001571 | [A] - HANNON ET AL., "Large Scale Wind Resource Mapping Using a State-of-the-Art 3D Scanning Lidar, Paper[online]", (200806), URL: http://www.res-americas.com/Resources/AWEA-2008_Large-Scale-Wind-Resource-Mapping-Using-a-State-of-the-Art-3D-Scanning-Lidar.pdf, (20110126), XP008154949 | [A] - JAYNES ET AL., "MTC Final Progress Report: LIDAR, MIT [online]", (20070719), URL: http://www.ceere.org/rerl/publications/reports/LIDAR_Final_Report_June_2007.pdf, (20110126), XP008154957 |