EP2480152 - SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING USE AND OPERATION OF A FAMILY OF DIFFERENT TREATMENT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/31] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING USE AND OPERATION OF A FAMILY OF DIFFERENT TREATMENT DEVICES | ||
[2018/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mederi Therapeutics Inc. P.O. Box 134 Cos Cob, CT 06807 / US | [2012/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIKHMAN, Oleg 286 Strobel Rd. Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Lees, Kate Jane Kate Lees Consulting Ltd Office 5 Acorn Business Centre Roberts End, Hanley Swan Malvern, Worcestershire WR8 0DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2012/31] | Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10819150.3 | 22.09.2010 | [2018/35] | WO2010US02588 | Priority number, date | US20090277260P | 22.09.2009 Original published format: US 277260 P | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011037621 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2480152 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2480152 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, G06F3/00, A61B18/08, A61B18/18, A61B18/00, A61B18/20, G06F3/048, A61B18/02, A61B18/04, A61B34/00, A61B18/12, G06F3/0484, G16H40/63, A61N7/00, G06F3/0481 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
A61B18/1485 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B18/1492 (US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B34/25 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61B18/02 (US);
A61B18/08 (EP,US);
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61B18/20 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00553 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,US);
A61B2018/044 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1425 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1807 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1861 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2065 (US);
A61B2034/252 (EP,US);
A61B2034/254 (EP,US);
A61B2218/002 (EP,US);
A61B2218/007 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0043 (US);
A61N7/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/37] | A61B18/14, G06F3/00, A61B19/00, A61B18/08, A61B18/18, A61B18/00, A61B18/20, G06F3/048, A61B18/02, A61B18/04 | ||
Former IPC [2012/31] | A61B18/14, G06F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Extension states | BA | 20.04.2012 | ME | 20.04.2012 | RS | 20.04.2012 | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG DER VERWENDUNG UND DES BETRIEBS EINER FAMILIE AN VERSCHIEDENEN BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2018/11] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR CONTROLLING USE AND OPERATION OF A FAMILY OF DIFFERENT TREATMENT DEVICES | [2018/11] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE COMMANDE DE L'UTILISATION ET DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE FAMILLE DE DIFFÉRENTS DISPOSITIFS DE TRAITEMENT | [2018/11] |
Former [2012/31] | SYSTEM UND VERAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER VERWENDUNG UND DES BETRIEBS EINER FAMILIE AN VERSCHIEDENEN BEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN | ||
Former [2012/31] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING USE AND OPERATION OF A FAMILY OF DIFFERENT TREATMENT DEVICES | ||
Former [2012/31] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE DE L'UTILISATION ET DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE FAMILLE DE DIFFÉRENTS DISPOSITIFS DE TRAITEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 30.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2017 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 05.04.2017 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 20.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2010 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | PT | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | IE | 22.09.2018 | LU | 22.09.2018 | MT | 22.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | FR | 29.10.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.09.2010 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PT | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
MT | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 29.10.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
MT | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 29.10.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
MT | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 29.10.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 29.10.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 29.10.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002198519 (QIN JAY [US], et al) [X] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X]US2005187546 (BEK ROBIN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0059] *; | [X]US7258688 (SHAH KRISHAN [CA], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009171184 (JENKINS KIMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2002198519 (QIN JAY [US], et al); | [Y]US2008097422 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al); | [Y]US2008154253 (DAMASCO SANFORD D [US], et al) | Examination | WO2004107989 | by applicant | US2005187546 |