EP2480252 - METHODS, COMPOSITIONS, AND KITS FOR REDUCING ANTI-ANTIBODY RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XBiotech, Inc 1055 West Hastings Street, Suite 300 Vancouver, BC V6E 2E9 / CA | [2012/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMARD, John 8201 East Riverside Drive, Bldg. 4 Suite 100 Austin, TX 78744 / US | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10819428.3 | 23.09.2010 | WO2010US49924 | Priority number, date | US20090245305P | 24.09.2009 Original published format: US 245305 P | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011038069 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2480252 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
C07K16/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/39566 (KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
G01N33/577 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Extension states | BA | 24.04.2012 | ME | 24.04.2012 | RS | 24.04.2012 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND KITS ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON REAKTIONEN AUF ANTIKÖRPER | [2012/31] | English: | METHODS, COMPOSITIONS, AND KITS FOR REDUCING ANTI-ANTIBODY RESPONSES | [2012/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, COMPOSITIONS ET NÉCESSAIRES POUR RÉDUIRE LES RÉPONSES AUX ANTI-ANTICORPS | [2012/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 04.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9216562 (LYNXVALE LTD [GB]) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0130852 (UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * * in particular, page 46, lines 13-15 *; | [A] - ROY JEFFERIS ET AL, "Human immunoglobulin allotypes", MABS, (20090101), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 1 - 7, XP055096625 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.1.4.9122 | [A] - ROSE G. MAGE, "Designing antibodies for human therapies", NATURE, (19880630), vol. 333, no. 6176, doi:10.1038/333807c0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 807 - 808, XP055108425 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/333807c0 | International search | [Y]US5792838 (SMITH MARJORIE [GB], et al); | [X] - GORMAN ET AL, "Humanisation of monoclonal antibodies for therapy", SEMIN. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 457 - 466, XP008154554 | [X] - MAGDELAINE-BEUZELIN ET AL, "IgG1 heavy chain-coding gene polymorphism (G1m allotypes) and development of antibodies-to-infliximab", PHARMACOGENET GENOMICS, (200905), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 383 - 387, XP008154557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/FPC.0b013e32832a06bf | [Y] - JONES ET AL., "A new assay uses monoclonal anti-Rh(D) antibodiesto determine rheumatoid factor specificity: reactivity to a monoclonal antibody of the Gm allotype G3m(21) is more frequent in rheumatoid patients negative for G3m(21)", CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 71, no. 3, pages 451 - 458, XP008154570 | [Y] - JEFFERIS, "Human immunoglobulin allotypes", MABS, (200907), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 332 - 338, XP008154555 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.1.4.9122 | [Y] - MEISSNER ET AL, "Revised Indications for the Use of Palivizumab and Respiratory Syncytial Virus Immune Globulin Intravenous for the Prevention of Respiratory Syncytial Virus Infections", PEDIATRICS, (2003), vol. 112, no. 6, pages 1147 - 1452, XP008154657 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1542/peds.112.6.1447 |