EP2484572 - VEHICLE MOTION CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAKADO Makoto c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
SAITO Shinjiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
YOKOYAMA Atsushi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI Junya c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
YOSHIDA Tatsuya c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2017/27] |
Former [2012/36] | 01 /
YAMAKADO Makoto c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO Shinjiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
YOKOYAMA Atsushi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKAHASHI Junya c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
05 /
YOSHIDA Tatsuya c/o HITACHI Ltd Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
Former [2012/32] | 01 /
YAMAKADO Makoto c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO Shinjiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
YOKOYAMA Atsushi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKAHASHI Junya c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
05 /
YOSHIDA Tatsuya c/o HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/27] |
Former [2012/32] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10820235.9 | 02.08.2010 | [2017/27] | WO2010JP62996 | Priority number, date | JP20090225938 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009225938 | [2012/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011040115 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2484572 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2484572 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/02, B60T8/1755, B60W10/12, B60W10/18, B60W30/00 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
B60W30/18145 (EP);
B60W10/04 (US);
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/119 (US);
B60W10/18 (EP,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,US);
B60W30/045 (EP,US);
B60T2270/302 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG VON FAHRZEUGBEWEGUNGEN | [2012/32] | English: | VEHICLE MOTION CONTROL DEVICE | [2012/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DU MOUVEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2012 | Translation filed | 09.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 11.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2010 | AL | 05.07.2017 | AT | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | IT | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MK | 05.07.2017 | NL | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | SM | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | IE | 02.08.2017 | LU | 02.08.2017 | MT | 02.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | NO | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 02.08.2010 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 02.08.2010 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 02.08.2010 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 02.08.2010 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.08.2010 | |
AT | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
MT | 02.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 02.08.2017 | ||
LU | 02.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | |
NO | 05.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1522475 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,5-8,10-12 * claims 1,2 * * paragraph [0020] * [A] 2,9; | [Y]EP1179464 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,5-8,10-12 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0063] *; | [I]US2006041364 (TSUKASAKI YUICHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0065] , [0073] * * claims 1-5 * * figure 5 *; | [A]EP1657138 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0039] *; | [A]EP1650096 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0022] * | International search | [X]JP2008290720 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JPH0752629 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2005096710 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2005306285 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2009107447 (HITACHI LTD) | by applicant | JP2009225938 | JPH0516789 | JP2002039435 | JPH09315277 | - M. YAMAKADO; M. ABE, "Improvement of Vehicle Agility and Stability by G-Vectoring Control", PROC. OF AVEC2008-080420 | - M. YAMAKADO; M. ABE, "Proposal of the longitudinal driver model in coordination with vehicle lateral motion based upon jerk information", REVIEW OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING, (200810), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 533 - 54 1 | - S. INAGALCI; 1. KUSHIRO; M. YAMAMOTO, "Analysis on Vehicle Stability in Critical Cornering Using Phase-Plane Method", PROC. OF AVEC1994- 9438411 |