EP2484518 - RESIN LAMINATED PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Katsunori c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-8589 / JP | 02 /
MUKOHATA, Daisuke c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-8589 / JP | 03 /
NARUTA, Mitsuru c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-8589 / JP | 04 /
TSUMURA, Kensuke c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-8589 / JP | 05 /
SAWA, Kazuhiro c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-8589 / JP | 06 /
TANIGUCHI, Koji c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-8589 / JP | 07 /
NAGATANI, Naoyuki c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD. 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka 618-8589 / JP | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Me/bk Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/32] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Me/bk Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10820385.2 | 17.09.2010 | WO2010JP66170 | Priority number, date | JP20090224785 | 29.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009224785 | JP20090250036 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009250036 | JP20100064190 | 19.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010064190 | JP20100200950 | 08.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010200950 | [2012/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011040266 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2484518 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, B32B5/18, B32B27/12, B32B27/20, B32B27/32, B32B27/36 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/00 (KR);
B32B27/20 (KR);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B5/18 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
E04C2/246 (EP,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | HARZLAMINIERTE PLATTE | [2012/32] | English: | RESIN LAMINATED PLATE | [2012/32] | French: | PLAQUE STRATIFIÉE EN RÉSINE | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2012 | Translation filed | 04.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 08.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2551302 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 8-11 * Comparative Examples 1 & 2 *; paragraphs [0019] - [0024]; examples 3,7 *; | [X]WO8505593 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 40, line 1 - page 41, line 15; examples 4-14; claim -; tables IV,V * * page 3, line 1 - page 17, line 13 *; | [I]US5143778 (SHUERT LYLE H [US]) [I] 1-4,6 * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 2; claim - *; | [I]EP1174263 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-7,12 * paragraphs [0008] - [0106]; example - * * paragraphs [0122] - [0128] *; | [Y]JP2001293829 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] * abstract *; | [I]EP1403038 (LANKHORST INDUTECH BV [NL]) [I] 1,6,12,16-18 * example - *; | [A] - CABRERA N O ET AL, "Design and manufacture of all-PP sandwich panels based on co-extruded polypropylene tapes", COMPOSITES PART B: ENGINEERING, ELSEVIER, UK, vol. 39, no. 7-8, doi:10.1016/J.COMPOSITESB.2008.03.010, ISSN 1359-8368, (20081001), pages 1183 - 1195, (20080707), XP024099772 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compositesb.2008.03.010 | [A] - J. G. LERTOLA ET AL, "Consolidation of high-modulus PET laminates and the role of chemical healing", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (19900705), vol. 40, no. 12, doi:10.1002/app.1990.070400110, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 113 - 126, XP055079039 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1990.070400110 | International search | [Y]JP2001293829 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007145280 (TEIJIN DUPONT FILMS JAPAN LTD); | [Y]JP2007154041 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2004238073 (KEIYO APOLLO KK, et al) | by applicant | JPH0428699B |