EP2484756 - NOVEL PACEMAKER CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Tottori University 101 Koyamacho-Minami 4-chome Tottori-shi Tottori 680-8550 / JP | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HISATOME, Ichiro c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION TOTTORI UNIVERSITY 86 Nishi-cho Yonago-shi Tottori 683-8503 / JP | 02 /
SHIRAYOSHI, Yasuaki c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION TOTTORI UNIVERSITY 86 Nishi-cho Yonago-shi Tottori 683-8503 / JP | 03 /
MIAKE, Junichiro c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION TOTTORI UNIVERSITY 86 Nishi-cho Yonago-shi Tottori 683-8503 / JP | [2012/40] |
Former [2012/32] | 01 /
HISATOME, Ichiro c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION TOTTORI UNIVERSITY 86 Nishi-cho Yonago-shi Tottori 683-8503 / JP | ||
02 /
SHIRAYOSHI, Yasuaki c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION TOTTORI UNIVERSITY 86 Nishi-cho Yonago-shi Tottori 683-8503 / JP | |||
03 /
MIAKE, Junichiro c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION TOTTORI UNIVERSITY 86 Nishi-cho Yonago-shi Tottori 683-8503 / JP | Representative(s) | Forrest, Graham Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2017/38] |
Former [2012/32] | Forrest, Graham Robert, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10820584.0 | 29.09.2010 | [2017/38] | WO2010JP66952 | Priority number, date | JP20090226760 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009226760 | [2012/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011040469 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2484756 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2484756 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2484756 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00, C07K16/28, C07K16/18, C12N5/0735, C12N5/077, C12N5/10 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C12N5/0606 (EP,US);
C12N5/0657 (EP,US);
C12N2506/02 (EP,US);
C12N2510/00 (EP,US);
C12N2533/54 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | C12N5/10, A61L27/00, C07K16/28, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE SCHRITTMACHERZELLE | [2012/32] | English: | NOVEL PACEMAKER CELL | [2012/32] | French: | NOUVELLE CELLULE GÉNÉRATRICE DE RYTHME | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2012 | Translation filed | 27.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 14.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 10.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2010 | AL | 20.09.2017 | AT | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | CZ | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | ES | 20.09.2017 | FI | 20.09.2017 | HR | 20.09.2017 | IT | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | LV | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | MK | 20.09.2017 | NL | 20.09.2017 | PL | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RO | 20.09.2017 | SE | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SK | 20.09.2017 | SM | 20.09.2017 | TR | 20.09.2017 | IE | 29.09.2017 | LU | 29.09.2017 | MT | 29.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | GB | 20.12.2017 | NO | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | IS | 20.01.2018 | DE | 04.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PT | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
DE | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
DE | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
MK | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
DE | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
DE | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
DE | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
DE | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
DE | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
DE | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
DE | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
LU | 29.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
DE | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
SM | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 20.09.2017 | |
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
HR | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
NO | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | |
NO | 20.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - D CAPILUPO ET AL, "Acta Physiologica Congress", THE 60TH NATIONAL CONGRESS OF THE ITALIAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, (20090901), vol. 197, XP055099679 [X] 1-6,10-12 * abstract * [Y] 7-9 [I] 14 | [XP] - MORIKAWA KUMI ET AL, "Identification, isolation and characterization of HCN4-positive pacemaking cells derived from murine embryonic stem cells during cardiac differentiation.", PACING AND CLINICAL ELECTROPHYSIOLOGY : PACE MAR 2010, (201003), vol. 33, no. 3, ISSN 1540-8159, pages 290 - 303, XP055099647 [XP] 1-12,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1540-8159.2009.02614.x | [Y] - OU DONG-BO ET AL, "Using embryonic stem cells to form a biological pacemaker via tissue engineering technology.", BIOESSAYS : NEWS AND REVIEWS IN MOLECULAR, CELLULAR AND DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY FEB 2009, (200902), vol. 31, no. 2, ISSN 1521-1878, pages 246 - 252, XP055099695 [Y] 7-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bies.200800179 | [T] - CHUNG YOUNG ET AL, "Human embryonic stem cell lines generated without embryo destruction", CELL STEM CELL, (200802), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 1934-5909, pages 113 - 117, XP002719579 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2007.12.013 | International search | [Y]WO2007014134 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al); | [Y]WO2009017254 (ASUBIO PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2007047522 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) | [X] - YASUAKI SHIRAYOSHI ET AL., "Ion Channel o Kashika Senbetsu Marker to shita ES Saibo Yurai Seibutsugakuteki Pacemaker Saibo no Juritsu to sono Tokusei no Kento", SHINDENZU, (2008), vol. 28, no. 5, page 466, XP008157434 | [X] - YANO, S. ET AL., "Changes of HCN gene expression and If currents in Nkx2.5-positive cardiomyocytes derived from murine embryonic stem cells during differentiation", BIOMED RES, (2008), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 195 - 203, XP008154655 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2220/biomedres.29.195 | [X] - KENTOKU YANAGI ET AL., "ES Saibo Yurai Shinkin Pacemaker Saibo no Jidono Iji ni Okeru Ion Channel HCN1, 4 Oyobi Cav3.1 no Igi", FOLIA ENDOCRINOLOGICA JAPONICA, (2006), vol. 82, no. 2, page 512, XP008154720 | [X] - BARBUTI, A. ET AL., "Molecular composition and Functional properties of f-channels in murine embryonic stem cell-derived pacemaker cells", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR CARDIOLOGY, (200903), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 343 - 351, XP008154569 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yjmcc.2008.12.001 | [X] - YANAGI, K. ET AL., "Hyperpolarization-activated cyclic nucleotide-gated channels and T-type calcium channels confer automaticity of embryonic stem cell-derived cardiomyocytes", STEM CELLS, DAYTON, OHIO, (2007), vol. 25, no. 11, pages 2712 - 2719, XP008154663 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2006-0388 | [Y] - YANG X.J. ET AL., "Mesenchymal stem cells as a gene delivery system to create biological pacemaker cells in vitro", THE JOURNAL OF INTERNATIONAL MEDICAL RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 36, no. 5, pages 1049 - 1055, XP008154681 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/147323000803600523 | [Y] - BOINK, G.J. ET AL., "Engineering physiologically controlled pacemaker cells with lentiviral HCN4 gene transfer", THE JOURNAL OF GENE MEDICINE, (2008), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 487 - 497, XP008154664 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jgm.1172 | [XP] - SHIRAYOSHI, Y. ET AL., "Identification, Isolation and Characterization of HCN4- positive Cardiac Pacemaking Cells Derived from Murine EGFP Knock-in Embryonic Stem Cells at HCN4 Locus", CIRC J, (20100301), vol. 74, no. 1, page 400, XP008155157 | [XP] - SHIN'ICHI ITO ET AL., "ES Saibo Yurai Shinzo Pacemaker Saibo no Bunshu to Tokusei Kaiseki", SAISEI IRYO, (20100205), vol. 9, page 216, XP008158415 | by applicant | JP2009226760 | - YANO S; MIAKE J; MIZUTA E; MANABE K; BAHRUDIN U; MORIKAWA K; ARAKAWA K ET AL., "Changes of HCN gene expression and I(f) currents in Nkx2.5-positive cardiomyocytes derived from murine embryonic stem cells during differentiation", BIOMED RES, (2008), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.2220/biomedres.29.195, pages 195 - 203, XP008154655 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2220/biomedres.29.195 | - KURATA Y; MATSUDA H; HISATOME I; SHIBAMOTO T., "Effects of pacemaker currents on creation and modulation of human ventricular pacemaker: theoretical study with application to biological pacemaker engineering", AM J PHYSIOL HEART CIRC PHYSIOL., (200701), vol. 292, no. 1, pages H701 - 18 |