EP2469678 - CHARGE/DISCHARGE CONTROL DEVICE AND POWER GENERATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKASHIMA, Takeshi c/o SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 5-5 Keihan Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Souichi c/o SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 5-5 Keihan Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | 03 /
HAGIHARA, Ryuzo c/o SANYO ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 5-5 Keihan Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10820586.5 | 29.09.2010 | WO2010JP66956 | Priority number, date | JP20090227970 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009227970 | JP20100077234 | 30.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010077234 | [2012/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011040471 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469678 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/32, H02J3/38 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
H02J3/32 (EP,US);
H02J7/34 (EP,US);
Y02E70/30 (EP,US);
Y02P90/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | LADE-/ENTLADESTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND STROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM | [2012/26] | English: | CHARGE/DISCHARGE CONTROL DEVICE AND POWER GENERATING SYSTEM | [2012/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE/DÉCHARGE ET SYSTÈME GÉNÉRATEUR DE COURANT | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2012 | Translation filed | 23.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 08.12.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2006287998 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [A]JP2009065787 (UNIV RYUKYUS); | [XE]JP2010220406 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | by applicant | JP2007228737 |