EP2485122 - OPTICAL POINTING DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT PROVIDED WITH THE SAME, AND LIGHT-GUIDE AND LIGHT-GUIDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAKE, Takahiro c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
MIKI, Renzaburou c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
NORO, Tetsushi c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
TAKAKURA, Hideya c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10820597.2 | 29.09.2010 | WO2010JP66974 | Priority number, date | JP20090227526 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009227526 | [2012/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011040482 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2485122 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06F3/041, G06F3/042, G06T1/00 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
G02B6/43 (EP,US);
G02B6/4214 (EP,US);
G06F3/042 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE ZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND DAMIT AUSGESTATTETES ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT SOWIE LICHTLEITER UND LICHTLEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2012/32] | English: | OPTICAL POINTING DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT PROVIDED WITH THE SAME, AND LIGHT-GUIDE AND LIGHT-GUIDING METHOD | [2012/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POINTAGE OPTIQUE ET ÉQUIPEMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE DOTÉ DUDIT DISPOSITIF, GUIDE DE LUMIÈRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE GUIDAGE DE LUMIÈRE | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2012 | Translation filed | 05.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 19.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003137494 (TULBERT DAVID J [CA]) [A] 6-12* paragraph [0180] - paragraph [0181]; figure 9d *; | [Y]WO2007008034 (CRUCIALTEC CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 2-6,15 * paragraphs [0063] - [0067]; figure 6 *; | [XY]FR2890208 (CHUAN LIANG IND CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1,7-14,16 * page 4, line 14 - line 30 * * page 8, line 31 - page 14, line 21 * [Y] 2-6,15; | [A]JP2007156648 (SHARP KK) [A] 4,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] *; | [XY]US2008239285 (WANG MENG-HUA [TW], et al) [X] 1,6-14,16 * paragraph [0035]; figure 6 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0040]; figure 9 * [Y] 2-5,15 | International search | [X]JPH1131216 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JPH11509639 (THE NATIONAL REGISTRY, INC.); | [A]JP2007050032 (CHUAN LIANG IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2008507787 | JP2008510248 | JP2008226224 |