EP2482964 - MIXING APPARATUS OF COMBUSTIBLE GAS AND COMBUSTION SUPPORTING GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Co., Ltd 27-1 Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATANO, Ryo 2-1-238 Kuwata-cho Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0841 / JP | 02 /
SHIMADA, Naoki 2-4-132 Kubota-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0026 / JP | 03 /
MIYATA, Eisaburo 38-8-206, Hongyotoku Ichikawa-chi Chiba 272-0103 / JP | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10820730.9 | 27.09.2010 | WO2010JP67303 | Priority number, date | JP20090226837 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009226837 | JP20090226841 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009226841 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011040618 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2482964 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/02, B01F5/00, B01F5/02, B01F15/04 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
B01F23/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01F25/3131 (EP,US);
B01F25/00 (KR);
B01F25/20 (KR);
B01F25/43141 (EP,US);
B01F25/45 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | MISCHVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSGAS UND VERBRENNUNGSUNTERSTÜTZENDES GAS | [2012/32] | English: | MIXING APPARATUS OF COMBUSTIBLE GAS AND COMBUSTION SUPPORTING GAS | [2012/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE MÉLANGE DE GAZ COMBUSTIBLE ET DE GAZ SUPPORT DE COMBUSTION | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 21.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2009029680 (JGC CORP, et al); | [Y]JPS58174229U (HITACH ZOSEN CORPORATION); | [Y]JPS53135869U (IHI CORPORATION); | [Y]JP2006326571 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JPS63265994 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JPS6394532U (MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES,LTD.); | [Y]JP2006021163 (TEIKOKU DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [A]JPH07204482 (SAMIIRU SHIEHAADO SHIBAN); | [A]JPH0967689 (SUGA TEST INSTRUMENTS) |