EP2483680 - ULTRAFAST SEQUENCING OF BIOLOGICAL POLYMERS USING A LABELED NANOPORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quantapore Inc. 1455 Adams Drive, Suite 1081 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Martin 1066 Pine Street Menlo Park California 94025 / US | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10820963.6 | 13.05.2010 | WO2010US34809 | Priority number, date | US20090277939P | 30.09.2009 Original published format: US 277939 P | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011040996 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2483680 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, B82B3/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/487 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (US);
G01N2021/6432 (US);
G01N33/48721 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2563/155, C12Q2563/119, C12Q2563/107 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/531, C12Q2565/101, C12Q2561/113 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/32] | G01N33/00, B82B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHNELLE SEQUENZIERUNG BIOLOGISCHER POLYMERE MITHILFE EINER MARKIERTEN NANOPORE | [2012/32] | English: | ULTRAFAST SEQUENCING OF BIOLOGICAL POLYMERS USING A LABELED NANOPORE | [2012/32] | French: | SÉQUENÇAGE ULTRARAPIDE DE POLYMÈRES BIOLOGIQUES AU MOYEN DE NANOPORES MARQUÉS | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 30.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 22.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006019247 (SU XING [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract *; | [XD]WO0118247 (LIFEBEAM TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [XD] 1-14 * abstract * | [I] - JAMES CLARKE ET AL, "Continuous base identification for single-molecule nanopore DNA sequencing", NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, (20090222), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.1038/nnano.2009.12, ISSN 1748-3387, pages 265 - 270, XP055028415 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nnano.2009.12 | [I] - TOM Z BUTLER ET AL, "Single-molecule DNA detection with an engineered MspA protein nanopore", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES - PNAS, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20081230), vol. 105, no. 52, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0807514106, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 20647 - 20652, XP007920663 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0807514106 | [XP] - MINGSHENG XU ET AL, "Perspectives and Challenges of Emerging Single-Molecule DNA Sequencing Technologies", SMALL, (20091204), vol. 5, no. 23, doi:10.1002/smll.200900976, ISSN 1613-6810, pages 2638 - 2649, XP055089734 [XP] 1-14 * page 2643 - page 2645; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/smll.200900976 | [I] - GUPTA ET AL, "Single-molecule DNA sequencing technologies for future genomics research", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, vol. 26, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.TIBTECH.2008.07.003, ISSN 0167-7799, (20081101), pages 602 - 611, (20080821), XP025589109 [I] 1-14 * page 607 - page 608; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2008.07.003 | [YD] - RHEE M ET AL, "Nanopore sequencing technology: research trends and applications", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, vol. 24, no. 12, ISSN 0167-7799, (20061201), pages 580 - 586, (20061201), XP027921666 [YD] 1-14 * the whole document * | [YD] - KASIANOWICZ JOHN J ET AL, "Characterization of individual polynucleotide molecules using a membrane channel", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES - PNAS, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19961101), vol. 93, doi:10.1073/PNAS.93.24.13770, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13770 - 13773, XP002139846 [YD] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.24.13770 | [I] - DANIEL BRANTON ET AL, "The potential and challenges of nanopore sequencing", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20080101), vol. 26, no. 10, doi:10.1038/NBT.1495, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1146 - 1153, XP002507807 [I] 1-14 * page 1146 - page 1152 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT.1495 | [X] - ZWOLAK M ET AL, "Colloquium: Physical approaches to DNA sequencing and detection", REVIEWS OF MODERN PHYSICS, AMERICAN PHYSICAL SOCIETY, US, (20080102), vol. 80, no. 1, doi:10.1103/REVMODPHYS.80.141, ISSN 0034-6861, pages 141 - 165, XP002609719 [X] 1-14 * page 147 - page 162; figures 7-22; tables III-IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/REVMODPHYS.80.141 | International search | [X]US2009035777 (KOKORIS ET AL.); | [Y] - DENNIS ET AL., "Quantum Dot-Fluorescent Protein Pairs as Novel Fluorescence Resonance Energy Transfer Probes.", NANO LETT., (2008), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 1439 - 1445, XP008154982 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl080358+ | [Y] - SANGER ET AL., "DNA sequencing with chain-terminating inhibitors.", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (1977), vol. 74, no. 12, pages 5463 - 5467, XP008154983 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.74.12.5463 | [A] - LIN ET AL., "Recent Patents and Advances in the Next-Generation Sequencing Technologies.", RECENT PATENT BIOMED ENG, (2008), vol. 1, pages 60 - 67, XP008154984 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1874764710801010060 |