EP2482933 - EMERGENCY BREATHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essex Industries, Inc. 7700 Gravois Road St. Louis, MO 63123-4728 / US | [2013/51] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Essex P.B. & R. Corp. 8007 Chivvis Drive St Louis, MO 63123 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Michael, T. 416 Green Haven Drive Swansea IL 62226 / US | 02 /
POSEY, B., Kelley 1 Fox Hollow Court Edwardsville IL 62025 / US | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Casbon, Paul Richard Lucas & Co 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Casbon, Paul Richard Lucas & Co, 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10821287.9 | 30.09.2010 | WO2010US50976 | Priority number, date | US20090247039P | 30.09.2009 Original published format: US 247039 P | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011041589 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2482933 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A62B7/02, A62B7/10, A62B31/00, A62B23/02 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
A62B18/04 (EP,US);
A61M16/0627 (EP,US);
A62B7/10 (EP,US);
A61M16/101 (EP,US);
A61M16/22 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0208 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0208, A61M2202/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | NOTATEMHILFSGERÄT | [2012/32] | English: | EMERGENCY BREATHING APPARATUS | [2012/32] | French: | APPAREIL RESPIRATOIRE D'URGENCE | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 29.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4614186 (JOHN TOM T [US]) [Y] 7 * figure - *[A] 1-3,8-12,15; | [XAYI]WO9303794 (OTTESTAD BREATHING SYST AS [NO], et al) [X] 1-4,8-12,15 * page 3, line 10 - page 7, line 12 * * figure - * [A] 13 [Y] 7 [I] 5; | [XA]WO2007096181 (MCMORROW ROGER [IE]) [X] 1,5,8-11,13 * abstract * * page 6, line 13 - page 16, line 6 * * figure - * [A] 2-4,7,12 | International search | [Y]KR20040092329 (PARK KYUNG SU); | [Y]KR200431561Y (KOREASAFETY CO., LTD.); | [Y]WO2007096181 (MCMORROW ROGER [IE]); | [Y]KR20080073270 (KWON CHIL SUNG [KR]) |