EP2483415 - RECOMBINANT C1 B-GLUCOSIDASE FOR PRODUCTION OF SUGARS FROM CELLULOSIC BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Codexis, Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Louis 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City California 94063 / US | 02 /
BAIDYAROY, Dipnath 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City California 94063 / US | 03 /
SZABO, Lorand 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City California 94063 / US | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Desmond Mark, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/04] |
Former [2012/32] | Chapman, Desmond Mark, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10821289.5 | 30.09.2010 | WO2010US50982 | Priority number, date | US20090247379P | 30.09.2009 Original published format: US 247379 P | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011041594 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2483415 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2483415 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/06, C12N9/42 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
C12N9/2445 (EP,US);
C12P19/02 (EP,US);
C12P19/14 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01021 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | C12P21/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTE C1-B-GLUCOSIDASE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZUCKERN AUS ZELLULOSISCHER BIOMASSE | [2012/32] | English: | RECOMBINANT C1 B-GLUCOSIDASE FOR PRODUCTION OF SUGARS FROM CELLULOSIC BIOMASS | [2012/32] | French: | C1 -GLYCOSIDASE RECOMBINANTE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE SUCRES À PARTIR D'UNE BIOMASSE CELLULOSIQUE | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 01.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2010 | AL | 21.01.2015 | AT | 21.01.2015 | BE | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | HR | 21.01.2015 | IT | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | SM | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | NO | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | IE | 30.09.2015 | LU | 30.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 21.01.2015 | |
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 21.01.2015 | |
NO | 21.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2008008070 (DYADIC INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * * paragraph [0087] * [A] 2-15; | [XA] - GUSAKOV ET AL, "N-Glycosylation in Chrysosporium lucknowense enzymes", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, PERGAMON, GB, (20071026), vol. 343, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CARRES.2007.10.014, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 48 - 55, XP022391965 [X] 1 * the whole document * * page 49, column 1, paragraph 3 * [A] 2-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2007.10.014 | International search | [X]US2007238155 (GUSAKOV ALEXANDER V [RU], et al); | [A]US2008199908 (SMITH MADS PETER TORRY [US], et al); | [XP]US2009280105 (GUSAKOV ALEXANDER VASILIEVICH [RU], et al) | by applicant | WO2008008070 | US6015707 | US5811381 | US6573086 | US2007238155 | US2008194005 | US2009099079 | WO2008073914 | WO9815633 | WO0179507 | US2003187243 | WO9600787 | EP0137280 | US4683202 | US5426039 | US4486553 | US2009061484 | US2008057541 | US2009209009 | US2008104724 | US7244605 | US5648263 | WO2004048592 | - LADISCH ET AL., ENZYME MICROB. TECHNOL., (1983), vol. 5, page 82 | - GUSAKOV ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 343, pages 48 - 55 | - GARG, A., "An addition to the genus Chrysosporium corda", MYCOPATHOLOGIA, (1966), vol. 30, pages 3 - 4 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1977), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787 | - ROMANOS ET AL., YEAST, (1992), vol. 8, pages 423 - 488 | - SIMONEN; PALVA, MICROBIOL REV, (1993), vol. 57, pages 109 - 137 | - BREVES ET AL., APPL. ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOL., (1997), vol. 63, page 3902 | - HENAUT; DANCHIN ET AL., Escherichia Salmonella, ASM PRES, (1996), pages 2047 - 2066 | - CODON W; JOHN PEDEN, GCG CODON PREFERENCE | - MCINERNEY, J. O, BIOINFORMATICS, (1998), vol. 14, pages 372 - 73 | - STENICO ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 222, pages 437 - 46 | - WRIGHT, F., GENE, (1990), vol. 87, pages 23 - 29 | - WADA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 2111 - 2118 | - NAKAMURA ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, page 292 | - HENAUT; DANCHIN ET AL., Escherichia coli and Salmonella, ASM PRESS, (1996), pages 2047 - 2066 | - UBERBACHER, E. C., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1996), vol. 266, pages 259 - 281 | - TIWARI ET AL., COMPUT. APPL. BIOSCI, (1997), vol. 13, pages 263 - 270 | - "Construction of two Gateway vectors for gene expression in fungi Plasmid", ZHU ET AL., FUNGI: BIOLOGY AND APPLICATIONS, WILEY, (2009), vol. 6, pages 128 - 33 | - HENRIKSEN ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 145, pages 729 - 34 | - PUNT ET AL., GENE, (1997), vol. 197, pages 189 - 93 | - WRIGHT ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (2005), vol. 16, pages 881 - 892 | - NUNBERG ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1984), vol. 4, pages 2306 - 2315 | - BOEL ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 1581 - 1585 | - BLAISEAU; LAFAY, GENE, (1992), vol. 120, pages 243 - 248 | - LIMON ET AL., CURR. GENET, (1995), vol. 28, pages 478 - 83 | - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1981), vol. 22, pages 1859 - 69 | - MATTHES ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 801 - 05 | - CARRUTHERS ET AL., COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMP. QUANT. BIOL.,, (1982), vol. 47, pages 411 - 18 | - ADAMS ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1983), vol. 105, page 661 | - "Guide to Molecular Cloning Techniques", BERGER; KIMMEL, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., vol. 152 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning - A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1989), vol. 1-3 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, CURRENT PROTOCOLS | - ARNHEIM; LEVINSON, C&EN, (19901001), pages 36 - 47 | - THE JOURNAL OF NIH RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 3, pages 81 - 94 | - KWOH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 1173 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 1874 | - LOMELL ET AL., J. CLIN. CHEM, (1989), vol. 35, page 1826 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 1077 - 1080 | - VAN BRUNT, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, pages 291 - 294 | - WU; WALLACE, GENE, (1989), vol. 4, page 560 | - BARRINGER ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 89, page 117 | - SOOKNANAN; MALEK, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 563 - 564 | - SHEIR-NEISS ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1984), vol. 20, pages 46 - 53 | - KELLY; HYNES, EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, page 475479 | - YELTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 1470 - 1474 | - TILBURN ET AL., GENE, (1982), vol. 26, pages 205 - 221 | - JOHNSTON ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, pages 1307 - 1311 | - CASE, M.E. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, pages 5259 - 5263 | - KINSEY, J.A.; J.A. RAMBOSEK, MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1984), vol. 4, pages 117 - 122 | - RICCIARDELLI ET AL., IN VITRO CELL DEV. BIOL, (1989), vol. 25, pages 1016 - 1024 | - Fundamental Methods Springer Lab Manual, SPRINGER-VERLAG | - TYMMS, In vitro Transcription and Translation Protocols: Methods in Molecular Biology, GARLAND PUBLISHING, (1995), vol. 37 | - HARRIS; ANGAL, Protein Purification Methods: A Practical Approach, IRL PRESS | - WILSON ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 37, page 767 | - PORATH ET AL., PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (1992), vol. 3, pages 263 - 281 | - BRIGHAM ET AL., Handbook on Bioethanol, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS, (1995), pages 119 - 141 | - VIIKARI ET AL., "Thermostable enzymes in lignocellulose hydrolysis", ADV BIOCHEM ENG BIOTECHNOL, (2007), vol. 108, doi:doi:10.1007/10_2007_065, pages 121 - 45, XP002510178 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/10_2007_065 | - YANAI; SATO, AM. J. ENOL. EITIC., (1999), vol. 50, pages 231 - 235 | - MASE ET AL., J. APPL. GLYCOSCI., (2004), vol. 51, pages 211 - 216 | - STANKE ET AL., "AUGUSTUS: ab initio prediction of alternative transcripts", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2006), vol. 34, pages W435 - 9 | - TER-HOVHANNISYAN ET AL., GENOME RES., (2008), vol. 18, pages 1979 - 90 | - BENDTSEN ET AL., "Improved prediction of signal peptides: SignalP 3.0", J MOL BIOL., (2004), vol. 340, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jmb.2004.05.028, pages 783 - 95, XP004516690 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2004.05.028 | - MAMIE ET AL., NATURE METHODS, (2007), vol. 4, pages 251 - 56 |