EP2483934 - SEMICONDUCTOR NANOPARTICLE/NANOFIBER COMPOSITE ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states South Dakota State University 815 Medary Avenue, Suite 201 Brookings, SD 57006 / US | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAO, Qiquan 2245 Bluegill Ave. Brookings SD 57006 / US | 02 /
JOSHI, Prakash 1424 8th Street Apt. A Brookings, SD 57006 / US | 03 /
FONG, Hao 3021 Cadillac Drive Rapid City SD 57703 / US | 04 /
GALIPEAU, David 917 Pamela Drive Brookings SD 57006 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Lifeng 3303 Horse Pen Creek Rd, Unit 1C Greensboro, NC 27410 / US | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Becker Kurig Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10821385.1 | 02.10.2010 | WO2010US51237 | Priority number, date | US20090248178P | 02.10.2009 Original published format: US 248178 P | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011041762 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2483934 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/042, H01L31/0224 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
H01G9/2031 (EP,US);
H01L31/042 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
H01L31/0224 (KR);
H01G9/2059 (EP,US);
Y02E10/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | HALBLEITER-NANOPARTIKEL-/NANOFASER-VERBUNDELEKTRODEN | [2012/32] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR NANOPARTICLE/NANOFIBER COMPOSITE ELECTRODES | [2012/32] | French: | ELECTRODES COMPOSITES À NANOPARTICULES/NANOFIBRES SEMI-CONDUCTRICES | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/44] | 14.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]KR20060110352 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]); | [A]KR20090022181 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]); | [A]KR20090065175 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]KR20070070797 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |