EP2486060 - SIGLEC 15 ANTIBODIES IN TREATING BONE LOSS-RELATED DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited 3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | [2017/12] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Alethia Biotherapeutics Inc. 141, avenue Président-Kennedy SB-5100 Montréal, QC H2X 1Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREMBLAY, Gilles Bernard 100 Denise-Lemaistre La Prairie Quebec J5R 6N8 / CA | 02 /
FILION, Mario 739 Maple Street Longueuil Quebec J4J 4M8 / CA | 03 /
STUIBLE, Matthew 1-2950 Brighton Avenue Montreal Quebec H3S 1T8 / CA | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Arends, William Gerrit Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Gardner, Rebecca Katherine Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10821519.5 | 06.10.2010 | WO2010CA01586 | Priority number, date | US20090248960P | 06.10.2009 Original published format: US 248960 P | US20090580943 | 16.10.2009 Original published format: US 580943 | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011041894 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2486060 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K31/7088, A61K31/713, A61K39/395, A61K49/00, A61P19/08, A61P35/00, G01N33/53, G01N33/574, C12N5/077 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/39533 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/42 (KR);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61K49/16 (KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/435 (KR);
C07K14/475 (KR);
C07K16/18 (KR);
C07K16/22 (KR);
C07K16/28 (KR);
C07K16/30 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/00 (CN);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/54 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | SIGLEC-15-ANTIKÖRPER BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON MIT KNOCHENVERLUST ZUSAMMENHÄNGENDEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2012/33] | English: | SIGLEC 15 ANTIBODIES IN TREATING BONE LOSS-RELATED DISEASE | [2012/33] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-SIGLEC 15 DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES LIÉES À UNE PERTE OSSEUSE | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 29.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 10.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2015 | Observations by third parties | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2016 | Observations by third parties | 16.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2017 | 31.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2377932 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-21 * examples 14,26,27,30 *; | [E]WO2012045481 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-21 * examples 1,6 *; | [A] - TAKAHATA ET AL, "Sialylation of cell surface glycoconjugates is essential for osteoclastogenesis", BONE, PERGAMON PRESS., OXFORD, GB, (20070612), vol. 41, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BONE.2007.03.016, ISSN 8756-3282, pages 77 - 86, XP022114073 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bone.2007.03.016 | [T] - HIRUMA YOSHIHARU ET AL, "Impaired osteoclast differentiation and function and mild osteopetrosis development in Siglec-15-deficient mice.", BONE MAR 2013, (201303), vol. 53, no. 1, ISSN 1873-2763, pages 87 - 93, XP002695726 [T] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bone.2012.11.036 | International search | [X]WO2007093042 (ALETHIA BIOTHERAPEUTICS INC [CA], et al); | [X]CA2698326 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP]); | [E]WO2010117011 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP], et al) | other | WO2010117011 | WO2011041894 | WO2014012165 |