|
13.06.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
25.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Statement under Art. 19 PCT |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Deficiencies in translation of international application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Claims filed under Art.19 PCT |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2011 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
31 |