10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
15.06.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
07.07.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.04.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.04.2016 |
First examination report |
|
14.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.03.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
06.03.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
18.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.12.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
23.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.07.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
13.07.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
06.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|