EP2488256 - NA-K PUMP MODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rasmussen, Helge H. 29 Mosman Street Mosman, NSW 2088 / AU | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2018/32] |
Former [2012/34] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10822911.3 | 15.10.2010 | [2018/32] | WO2010AU01367 | Priority number, date | AU20090905055 | 15.10.2009 Original published format: AU 2009905055 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011044636 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2488256 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2488256 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, // A61K38/00 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | A61P9/10, A61K38/17, A61P35/00, C07K14/435 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NA/K-PUMPEN-MODULATION | [2012/34] | English: | NA-K PUMP MODULATION | [2012/34] | French: | MODULATION DE POMPE NA-K | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 07.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 14.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.06.2017 | 14.06.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.07.2017 | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2010 | AL | 08.08.2018 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | PT | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | IE | 15.10.2018 | LU | 15.10.2018 | MT | 15.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.10.2018 | ||
MT | 15.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.10.2018 | ||
MT | 15.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.10.2018 | ||
MT | 15.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.10.2018 | ||
MT | 15.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 15.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 15.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 15.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 15.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - Anonymous, "Protecting the heart from Ischemia-reperfusion injury: a new role for FXYD proteins?", (20090331), The University of Sydney, URL: http://sydney.edu.au/research/opportunities/opportunities/1424, (20130904), XP002713129 [X] 1-3,10-13 * the whole document * [Y] 4-9 | [Y] - KAYED H ET AL, "FXYD3 is overexpressed in pancreatic ductal adenocarcinoma and influences pancreatic cancer cell growth", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, UNION INTERNATIONALE CENTRE LE CANCER, vol. 118, no. 1, doi:10.1002/IJC.21257, ISSN 0020-7136, (20060101), pages 43 - 54, (20050707), XP002585528 [Y] 4-9 * page 53, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/IJC.21257 | [Y] - WONG J C ET AL, "W1877 Changes in FXYD3 and NPM1 Expressions Are Early Markers of Adenomas in the Colon", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, vol. 136, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S0016-5085(09)63436-3, ISSN 0016-5085, (20090501), pages A - 745, (20090501), XP026113983 [Y] 4-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(09)63436-3 | [Y] - NAKANISHI YUKIHIRO ET AL, "Prognostic significance of dysadherin expression in tongue cancer: Immunohistochemical analysis of 91 cases", APPLIED IMMUNOHISTOCHEMSITRY AND MOLECULAR MORPHOLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (20041201), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 1541-2016, pages 323 - 328, XP009172612 [Y] 4-9 * page 327, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00129039-200412000-00006 | [Y] - LIU J-G ET AL, "Expression of FXYD6 in pancreatic adenocarcinoma and its clinical significance", SHIJIE HUAREN XIAOHUA ZAZHI - WORLD CHINESE JOURNAL OF DIGESTOLOGY, SHIJIE WEI-CHANGBINGXUE ZAZHISHE, TAIYUAN, CN, (20080301), vol. 16, no. 5, ISSN 1009-3079, pages 540 - 543, XP009172301 [Y] 4-9 * abstract * | [Y] - ARIMOCHI JUNKO ET AL, "Interaction of Mat-8 (FXYD-3) with Na+/K+-ATPase in colorectal cancer cells", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (200704), vol. 30, no. 4, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 648 - 654, XP002713130 [Y] 4-9 * page 648, column 1 * * page 654, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/bpb.30.648 | [YP] - OKUDELA KOJI ET AL, "Down-Regulation of FXYD3 Expression in Human Lung Cancers Its Mechanism and Potential Role in Carcinogenesis", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (200912), vol. 175, no. 6, pages 2646 - 2656, XP002713134 [YP] 4-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2353/AJPATH.2009.080571 | [A] - FIGTREE GEMMA A ET AL, "Reversible Oxidative Modification A Key Mechanism of Na+-K+ Pump Regulation", CIRCULATION RESEARCH, (200907), vol. 105, no. 2, doi:10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.109.199547, ISSN 0009-7330, XP002713132 [A] 1-13 * Pages 185-193, Online Supplement: pages 1 -17 * * page 191, paragraph Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.109.199547 | [T] - BIBERT STEPHANIE ET AL, "FXYD Proteins Reverse Inhibition of the Na+-K+ Pump Mediated by Glutathionylation of Its beta(1) Subunit", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (201105), vol. 286, no. 21, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 18562 - 18572, XP002713133 [T] * page 18571, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.184101 | International search | [X] - GARTY, H. ET AL., "Role of FXYD Proteins in Ion Transport", ANNUAL REVIEW OF PHYSIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 68, pages 431 - 459, XP008156195 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.physiol.68.040104.131852 | [X] - GEERING, K., "FXYD Proteins: New Regulators of Na-K-ATPase", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY-RENAL PHYSIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 290, no. 2, pages F241 - F250, XP008156196 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajprenal.00126.2005 | [X] - WETZEL, R. K. ET AL., "Stress-Induced Expression of the Gamma Subunit (FXYD2) Modulates Na,K-ATPase Activity and Cell Growth", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 279, no. 40, pages 41750 - 41757, XP008156202 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M405622200 | [X] - SHATTOCK, M. J. ET AL., "Phospholemman: Its Role in Normal Cardiac Physiology and Potential as a Drugable Target in Disease", CURRENT OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY., (200904), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 160 - 166, XP008156199 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coph.2008.12.015 | [Y] - PIERRE, S. V. ET AL., "Ouabain Triggers Preconditioning Through Activation of the Na+,K+-ATPase Signaling Cascade in Rat Hearts", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH., (2007), vol. 73, no. 3, pages 488 - 496, XP008156200 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cardiores.2006.11.003 | [Y] - WANG, J. K. T. ET AL., "Cardiac glycosides Provide Neuroprotection Against Ischemic Stroke: Discovery by a Brain Slice-Based Compound Screening Platform", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA., (2006), vol. 103, no. 27, pages 10461 - 10466, XP008156205 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0600930103 | [Y] - MIJATOVIC, T. ET AL., "Na+/K+-ATPase Alpha Subunits as New Targets in Anticancer Therapy", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC TARGETS., (2008), vol. 12, no. 11, pages 1403 - 1417, XP008156203 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517114728220802482056 | Examination | - GRZMIL M ET AL, "UP-REGULATED EXPRESSION OF THE MAT-8 GENE IN PROSTATE CANCER AND ITS SIRNA-MEDIATED INHIBITION OF EXPRESSION INDUCES A DECREASE IN PROLIFERATION OF HUMAN PROSTATE CARCINOMA CELLS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, (2004), vol. 24, pages 97 - 105 | - LOFTAS P ET AL, "EXPRESSION OF FXYD-3 IS AN INDEPENDENT PROGNOSTIC FACTOR IN RECTAL CANCER PATIENTS WITH PREOPERATIVE RADIOTHERAPY", INT J RADIATION ONCOLOGY BIOL PHYS, (2009), vol. 75, no. 1, pages 137 - 142 | by applicant | - Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, Inc. | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology | - Methods in Cell Biology, Academic Press, (19760000), vol. XIV, page 33 | - ARIMOCHI, J.; OHASHI-KOBAYASHI, A.; MAEDA, M., "Interaction of Mat-8 (FXYD-3) with Na+/K+-ATPase in colorectal cancer cells", Biol Pharm Bull, (20070000), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1248/bpb.30.648, pages 648 - 654, XP002713130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/bpb.30.648 | - ATTALI, B.; LATTER, H.; RACHAMIM, N.; GARTY, H., "A corticosteroid-induced gene expressing an ''IsK-like'' K+ channel activity in Xenopus oocytes", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19950000), vol. 92, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.92.13.6092, pages 6092 - 6096, XP002052595 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.13.6092 | - BEGUIN, P.; CRAMBERT, G.; MONNET-TSCHUDI, F.; ULDRY, M.; HORISBERGER, J.-D.; GARTY, H.; GEERING, K., "FXYD7 is a brain-specific regulator of Na,K-ATPase {alpha} 1-{beta} isozymes", EMBO J, (20020000), vol. 21, pages 3264 - 3273 | - CHOW, D.C.; BROWNING, C.M.; FORTE, J.G., "Gastric H+-K+-ATPase activity is inhibited by reduction of disulfide bonds in beta-subunit", Am J Physiol, (19920000), vol. 263, pages C39 - 46 | - CORNELIUS, F.; MAHMMOUD, Y.A., "Functional modulation of the sodium pump: the regulatory proteins ''Fixit", News Physiol Sci, (20030000), vol. 18, pages 119 - 124 | - CROWELL, K.J.; FRANZIN, C.M.; KOLTAY, A.; LEE, S.; LUCCHESE, A.M.; SNYDER, B.C.; MARASSI, F.M., "Expression and characterization of the FXYD ion transport regulators for NMR structural studies in lipid micelles and lipid bilayers", Biochim Biophys Acta, (20030000), vol. 1645, doi:doi:10.1016/S1570-9639(02)00473-9, pages 15 - 21, XP004401454 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1570-9639(02)00473-9 | - DENG, V.; MATAGNE, V.; BANINE, F.; FRERKING, M.; OHLIGER, P.; BUDDEN, S.; PEVSNER, J.; DISSEN, G.A.; SHERMAN, L.S.; OJEDA, S.R., "FXYD1 is an MeCP2 target gene overexpressed in the brains of Rett syndrome patients and Mecp2-null mice", Hum Mol Genet, (20070000), vol. 16, pages 640 - 650 | - FIGTREE, G.A.; LIU, C.C.; BIBERT, S.; HAMILTON, E.J.; GARCIA, A.; WHITE, C.N.; CHIA, K.K.M.; CORNELIUS, F.; GEERING, K.; RASMUSSEN, "Reversible oxidative modification: a key mechanism of Na+-K+ pump regulation", Circ Res, (20090000), vol. 105, doi:doi:10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.109.199547, pages 185 - 193, XP002713132 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCRESAHA.109.199547 | - FU, X.; KAMPS, M., "E2a-Pbxl induces aberrant expression of tissue-specific and developmentally regulated genes when expressed in NIH 3T3 fibroblasts", Mol Cell Biol, (19970000), vol. 17, pages 1503 - 1512 | - GEERING, K., "The functional role of the beta-subunit in the maturation and intracellular transport of Na,K-ATPase", FEBS Lett, (19910000), vol. 285, pages 189 - 193 | - GEERING, K., "FXYD proteins: new regulators of Na-K-ATPase", Am J Physiol Renal Physiol, (20060000), vol. 290, pages F241 - 250 | - GHEZZI, P., "Regulation of protein function by glutathionylation", Free Radic Res, (20050000), vol. 39, pages 573 - 580 | - KAYED, H.; KLEEFF, J.; KOLB, A.; KETTERER, K.; KELEG, S.; FELIX, K.; GIESE, T.; PENZEL, R.; ZENTGRAF, H.; BUCHLER, M.W. et al., "FXYD3 is overexpressed in pancreatic ductal adenocarcinoma and influences pancreatic cancer cell growth", Int J Cancer, (20060000), vol. 118, doi:doi:10.1002/IJC.21257, pages 43 - 54, XP002585528 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/IJC.21257 | - MEIJ, I.C.; KOENDERINK, J.B.; VAN BOKHOVEN, H.; ASSINK, K.F.; GROENESTEGE, W.T.; DE PONT, J.J.; BINDELS, R.J.; MONNENS, L.A.; VAN, "Dominant isolated renal magnesium loss is caused by misrouting of the Na(+),K(+)-ATPase gamma-subunit", Nat Genet, (20000000), vol. 26, pages 265 - 266 | - MERCER, R.W.; BIEMESDERFER, D.; BLISS, D.P.; COLLINS, J.H.; FORBUSH, B., "Molecular cloning and immunological characterization of the gamma-polypeptide, a small protein associated with the Na,K-ATPase", J Cell Biol, (19930000), vol. 121, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.121.3.579, pages 579 - 586, XP002052594 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.121.3.579 | - MIJATOVIC T.; VAN QUAQUEBEKE E.; DELEST B.; DEBEIR O.; DARRO F.; KISS R., "Cardiotonic steroids on the road to anti-cancer therapy", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta, (20070000), vol. 1776, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbcan.2007.06.002, pages 32 - 57, XP022219017 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbcan.2007.06.002 | - MORRISON, B.W.; MOORMAN, J.R.; KOWDLEY, G.C.; KOBAYASHI, Y.M.; JONES, L.R.; LEDER, P., "Mat-8, a novel phospholemman-like protein expressed in human breast tumors, induces a chloride conductance in Xenopus oocytes", J Biol Chem, (19950000), vol. 270, pages 2176 - 2182 | - MORTH, J.P.; PEDERSEN, B.P.; TOUSTRUP-JENSEN, M.S.; SORENSEN, T.L.; PETERSEN, J.; ANDERSEN, J.P; VILSEN, B.; NISSEN, P., "Crystal structure of the sodium-potassium pump", Nature, (20070000), vol. 450, doi:doi:10.1038/NATURE06419, pages 1043 - 1049, XP002518840 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NATURE06419 | - PALMER, C.J.; SCOTT, B.T.; JONES, L.R., "Purification and complete sequence determination of the major plasma membrane substrate for cAMP-dependent protein kinase and protein kinase C in myocardium", J Biol Chem, (19910000), vol. 266, pages 11126 - 11130, XP002052593 | - PRESTI, C.F.; JONES, L.R.; LINDEMANN, J.P., "Isoproterenol-induced phosphorylation of a 15-kilodalton sarcolemmal protein in intact myocardium", J Biol Chem, (19850000), vol. 260, pages 3860 - 3867 | - SHINODA, T.; OGAWA, H.; CORNELIUS, F.; TOYOSHIMA, C., "Crystal structure of the sodium-potassium pump at 2.4 A resolution", Nature, (20090000), vol. 459, pages 446 - 450 | - SWEADNER, K.J.; RAEL, E., "The FXYD gene family of small ion transport regulators or channels: cDNA sequence, protein signature sequence, and expression", Genomics, (20000000), vol. 68, doi:doi:10.1006/geno.2000.6274, pages 41 - 56, XP004437859 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.2000.6274 | - WHITE, C.N.; FIGTREE, G.A.; LIU, C.C.; GARCIA, A.; HAMILTON, E.J.; CHIA, K.K.; RASMUSSEN, H.H., "Angiotensin II inhibits the Na+-K+ pump via PKC dependent activation of NADPH oxidase", Am J Physiol Cell Physiol, (20090000), vol. 296, pages C693 - 700 | - WHITE CN.; LIU CC; GARCIA A; HAMILTON EJ; CHIA KK; FIGTREE GA; RASMUSSEN HH, "Activation of cAMP-dependent signaling induces oxidative modification of the cardiac Na+-K+ pump and inhibits its activity", J Biol Chem, (20100000), vol. 285, pages 13712 - 20 | - YAMAGUCHI, F.; YAMAGUCHI, K.; TAI, Y.; SUGIMOTO, K.; TOKUDA, M., "Molecular cloning and characterization of a novel phospholemman-like protein from rat hippocampus", Brain Res Mol Brain Res, (20010000), vol. 86, pages 189 - 192 |