EP2489351 - INCLUSION COMPLEX OF DEOXYPODOPHYLLOTOXIN OF CYCLODEXTRIN, PREPARATION METHOD, USE FOR TREAMENT OF CANCER THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Pharmaceutical University No.24 Tongjiaxiang Gulou District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210009 / CN | For all designated states Luo, Houwei 2-501 No.23 Luxiying Gulou Nanjing, Jiangsu 210009 / CN | For all designated states Wu, Baojin 5-3-101 No.40 Majiajie Gulou Nanjing, Jiangsu 210009 / CN | For all designated states Wu, Changxuan 12-1-502 No.21 Luxiying Gulou Nanjing, Jiangsu 210009 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states China Pharmaceutical University No.24 Tongjiaxiang Gulou District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210009 / CN | ||
For all designated states Luo, Houwei 2-501 No.23 Luxiying Gulou Nanjing, Jiangsu 210009 / CN | |||
For all designated states Wu, Baojin 5-3-101 No.40 Majiajie Gulou Nanjing, Jiangsu 210009 / CN | |||
For all designated states Wu, Changxuan 12-1-502 No.21 Luxiying Gulou Nanjing, Jiangsu 210009 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Houwei 2-501 No.23 Luxiying Gulou Nanjing Jiangsu 210009 / CN | 02 /
WU, Baojin 5-3-101 No.40 Majiajie Gulou Nanjing Jiangsu 210009 / CN | 03 /
WU, Changxuan 12-1-502 No.21 Luxiying Gulou Nanjing Jiangsu 210009 / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Xiong No.24 Tongjiaxiang Nanjing Jiangsu 210009 / CN | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10823054.1 | 01.10.2010 | WO2010CN77554 | Priority number, date | CN20091035978 | 15.10.2009 Original published format: CN200910035978 | [2012/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011044824 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2489351 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/365, A61K47/40, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61K47/48 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K47/6951 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | A61K31/365, A61K47/40, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | EINSCHLUSSKOMPLEX FÜR DEOXYPODOPHYLLOTOXIN AUS CYCLODEXTRIN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND SEINE VERWENDUNG ZUR KREBSBEHANDLUNG | [2012/34] | English: | INCLUSION COMPLEX OF DEOXYPODOPHYLLOTOXIN OF CYCLODEXTRIN, PREPARATION METHOD, USE FOR TREAMENT OF CANCER THEREOF | [2012/34] | French: | COMPLEXE D'INCLUSION DE DÉSOXYPODOPHYLLOTOXINE DE CYCLODEXTRINE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, SON UTILISATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2012 | Translation filed | 07.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 25.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN101439188 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 52, Database accession no. 2009-J94768, XP002691924 & CN101439188 A 20090527 (CHINESE PEOPLES ARMED POLICES FORCE) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * [I] 1,4-10 | International search | [X]CN1424112 (SHANGHAI MEDICAL POLYTECHNIC A [CN]); | [X]CN1879887 (UNIV SHENYANG PHARMACEUTICAL [CN]) |