EP2488666 - BIOMARKERS AND IDENTIFICATION METHODS FOR THE EARLY DETECTION AND RECURRENCE PREDICTION OF BREAST CANCER USING NMR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation 1281 Win Hentschel Boulevard West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAFTERY, M. Daniel 615 Hillcrest Road West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 02 /
ASIAGO, Vincent 10310 Providence Drive, no 304 Johnston, IA 50131 / US | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10823730.6 | 13.10.2010 | WO2010US02731 | Priority number, date | US20090250917P | 13.10.2009 Original published format: US 250917 P | US20090285672P | 11.12.2009 Original published format: US 285672 P | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011046597 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2488666 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/465, G01N33/574, G01N33/68 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
G01N33/57415 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
G01N33/6842 (EP,US);
G01N2570/00 (EP,US);
G01R33/4625 (EP,US);
G01R33/465 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | C12Q1/68, A61B10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | BIOMARKER UND IDENTIFIKATIONSVERFAHREN ZUR FRÜHEN ERKENNUNG UND ZUR VORHERSAGE DES WIEDERAUFTRETENS VON BRUSTKREBS DURCH NMR | [2012/34] | English: | BIOMARKERS AND IDENTIFICATION METHODS FOR THE EARLY DETECTION AND RECURRENCE PREDICTION OF BREAST CANCER USING NMR | [2012/34] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS ET PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION POUR LA DÉTECTION PRÉCOCE ET LA PRÉDICTION DE LA RÉCIDIVE D'UN CANCER DU SEIN À L'AIDE DE RMN (RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE NUCLÉAIRE) | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 09.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009046305 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-13 * abstract, paragraphs [0003], [0010]-[0016], [0031]-[0034] and [0038]-[0039] *; | [E]WO2011041892 (SLUPSKY CAROLYN [US]) [E] 1-8,10-13 * paragraphs [0005], [0009]-[0011], [0037]-[0040] and [0063], table 9 *; | [X] - MATTIAS RANTALAINEN ET AL, "Statistically Integrated Metabonomic-Proteomic Studies on a Human Prostate Cancer Xenograft Model in Mice", JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, (20061001), vol. 5, no. 10, doi:10.1021/pr060124w, ISSN 1535-3893, pages 2642 - 2655, XP055060026 [X] 1,2,5,6,12,13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/pr060124w | [X] - HUANWEN CHEN ET AL, "Combining desorption electrospray ionization mass spectrometry and nuclear magnetic resonance for differential metabolomics without sample preparation", RAPID COMMUNICATIONS IN MASS SPECTROMETRY, (20060530), vol. 20, no. 10, doi:10.1002/rcm.2474, ISSN 0951-4198, pages 1577 - 1584, XP055060033 [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/rcm.2474 | [T] - GU H ET AL, "Principal component directed partial least squares analysis for combining nuclear magnetic resonance and mass spectrometry data in metabolomics: Application to the detection of breast cancer", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 686, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.ACA.2010.11.040, ISSN 0003-2670, (20110207), pages 57 - 63, (20110112), XP027599136 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.aca.2010.11.040 | International search | [X]WO2009046305 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al); | [Y]US2009047269 (CHINNAIYAN ARUL M [US], et al); | [X]US2008081375 (TESIRAM YASVIR A [US], et al); | [Y]US2007055456 (RAFTERY DANIEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2007178599 (KADDURAH-DAOUK RIMA [US], et al) | [Y] - ISSAQ ET AL., "Detection of Bladder Cancer in Human Urine by Metabolomic Profiling Using High Performance LiquidChromatography/Mass Spectrometry'", THE JOUMAL OF UROLOGY, (200806), vol. 179, doi:doi:10.1016/j.juro.2008.01.084, pages 2422 - 2426, XP022650280 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.juro.2008.01.084 | [Y] - SPRATLIN ET AL., "Clinical Applications of Metabolomics in Oncology: A Review", CLIN CANCER RES, (200901), vol. 15, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-1059, pages 431 - 440, XP002600660 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-1059 | [Y] - GOWDA ET AL., "Metabolomics-based methods for early disease diagnostics", EXPERT REVIEW OF MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS, (200809), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1586/14737159.8.5.617, pages 617 - 633, XP008111462 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/14737159.8.5.617 | [Y] - HENNEGES, "Prediction of breast cancer by profiling of urinary RNA metabolites using Support Vector Machine-based feature selection", BMC CANCER, (200904), vol. 9, no. 104, doi:doi:10.1186/1471-2407-9-104, page 104, XP021048981 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2407-9-104 | [Y] - GRIFFIN ET AL., "Metabolic Profiles of Cancer Cells", NATURE REVIEWS CANCER, (200407), vol. 4, pages 551 - 561 | [Y] - YANG ET AL., "Comparative Metabolomics of Breast Cancer", PACIFIC SYMPOSIUM ON BIOCOMPUTING, (2007), vol. 12, pages 181 - 192, XP009168793 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1142/9789812772435_0018 | [Y] - NARASIMHAMURTHY ET AL., "Class selection of amino acid metabolites in body fluids using chemical derivation and their enhanced 13C NMR", PNAS, (200707), vol. 104, no. 28, pages 11540 - 11544 | [Y] - PAN ET AL., "Comparing and combining NMR spectroscopy and mass spectrometry in metabblomics", ANAL BIOANAL CHEM, (2007), vol. 387, pages 525 - 527, XP019471968 | [Y] - BATHEN ET AL., "MR-determined metabolic phenotype of breast cancer in prediction of lymphatic spread, grade, and hormone status", BREAST CANCER RES TREAT, (2007), vol. 104, pages 181 - 189, XP019524390 | [Y] - RAFTERY, "Advanced Methods in NMR-Based Metabolomics", NIH, (200908), Database accession no. 3R01GM085291-0251, URL: http://projectreporter.nih.gov/reporter.cfm |