EP2488213 - OXIDATION OF ENVIRONMENTAL CONTAMINANTS WITH MIXED VALENT MANGANESE OXIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verutek Technologies, Inc. 65 West Dudley Town Road Bloomfield, CT 06002 / US | For all designated states The University of Connecticut 263 Farmington Avenue Farmington, CT 06030-6400 / US | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUIB, Steven 88 Hanks Hill Road Storrs Connecticut 06268 / US | 02 /
STAFFORD, Lisa 5G Zygmunt Drive Storrs Connecticut 06268 / US | 03 /
HUANG, Hui Xiay Cun No. 42 Shuangming Zhen Yushan City Jiangxi Province 334700 / CN | 04 /
HOAG, George E. 65 West Dudley Town Road Bloomfield Connecticut 06002 / US | 05 /
COLLINS, John B. 23 Coates Farm Road Amston Connecticut 06231 / US | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10824045.8 | 13.10.2010 | WO2010US52546 | Priority number, date | US20090251458P | 14.10.2009 Original published format: US 251458 P | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011047082 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2488213 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/00, B09C1/08, C01G45/12, C01B37/00 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
B09C1/08 (EP,US);
C01B37/00 (EP,US);
C01G45/12 (EP,US);
C01G45/1221 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2002/77 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | A61L2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | OXIDATION VON UMWELTSCHADSTOFFEN MIT WERTIGEN MANGANMISCHOXIDEN | [2012/34] | English: | OXIDATION OF ENVIRONMENTAL CONTAMINANTS WITH MIXED VALENT MANGANESE OXIDES | [2012/34] | French: | OXYDATION DE CONTAMINANTS DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT PAR DES OXYDES DE MANGANÈSE À VALENCE MIXTE | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 08.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 10.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2013 | 31.10.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5667695 (BEDARD ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,8 * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]US5702674 (O'YOUNG CHI LIN [US], et al) [Y] 2-15 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2008207981 (HOAG GEORGE E [US], et al) [Y] 2-15 * claims 1,11,14,20,27,91 *; | [A]US2006177367 (LI LIYU [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [XY] - JOTHIRAMALINGAM R ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of cerium doped OMS-2 type manganese oxide materials - promising catalysts for oxidation of hazardous pollutants", vol. 3, (20040101), pages 94 - 98, BULLETIN OF THE CATALYSIS SOCIETY OF INDIA,, URL: http://catalysis.chem.iitm.ac.in/articles/333.pdf, XP008158228 [X] 1 * columns 1,3 - paragraph 1 * [Y] 2-15 | International search | [Y]US2008207981 (HOAG GEORGE E [US], et al); | [Y]US2004134857 (HULING SCOTT G [US], et al); | [A]US6517802 (XIAO TONGSAN D [US], et al); | [A]US2003166466 (HOKE JEFFREY B [US], et al) | [X] - JOTHIRAMALINGAM ET AL., "Synthesis and characterization of cerium doped OMS-2 type manganese oxide materials - promising catalysts for oxidation of hazardous pollutants", BULLETIN OF THE CATALYSIS SOCIETY OF INDIA, (2004), vol. 3, pages 94 - 98, XP008158228 |