EP2488668 - NOVEL HUMAN SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE POLYMORPHISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2023/30] |
Former [2016/47] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULERO, Julio 979 Asilomar Terrace 7 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
MALICDEM, Michael 3285 Homestead Road 1 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 03 /
LAGACE, Robert 5831 Ross Street Oakland, California 94618 / US | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/30] |
Former [2012/34] | Weber, Birgit, et al Life Technologies GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 129 B 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 10824211.6 | 15.10.2010 | [2023/30] | WO2010US52935 | Priority number, date | US20090252141P | 15.10.2009 Original published format: US 252141 P | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011047329 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2488668 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2488668 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6858, C12Q1/6888 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6888 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (US);
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US);
C12Q2525/117 (EP,US);
C12Q2563/107 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE MENSCHLICHE EINZELNUKLEOTID-POLYMORPHISMEN | [2012/34] | English: | NOVEL HUMAN SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE POLYMORPHISMS | [2012/34] | French: | NOUVEAUX POLYMORPHISMES MONONUCLÉOTIDIQUES HUMAINS | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 21.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2021 | Observations by third parties | 04.08.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2021 | Observations by third parties | 07.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2019 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | LU | 15.10.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/30] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 15.10.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6531282 (DAU PETER C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-24 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - line 21 * * column 1, line 43 - line 67 * * column 5, line 21 - line 32; claim 9; table 2 * * example 36 * * column 30, line 30 - line 36 * * column 31, line 39 - line 45 * * column 33, line 26 - line 45 * * column 63 - column 64; example 45 * [I] 4,5; | [XI]WO2008104002 (IBIS BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12,14,16-23 * abstract * * page 13, line 24 - line 25 * * page 14, line 13 - line 22 * * page 15, line 26 - line 36 *[I] 8,13,15,24; | [A] - BECKER ET AL, "New alleles and mutational events at 14 STR loci from different German populations", 20070910, (20070910), vol. 1, no. 3-4, pages 232 - 237, XP022241114 [A] 1-24 * abstract * * page 234, paragraph 3.3 - page 235 * | [A] - CLAYTON T M ET AL, "Primer binding site mutations affecting the typing of STR loci contained within the AMPFlSTR SGM Plus kit.", FORENSIC SCIENCE INTERNATIONAL 28 JAN 2004, (20040128), vol. 139, no. 2-3, ISSN 0379-0738, pages 255 - 259, XP002784149 [A] 1-24 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.forsciint.2003.10.004 | [A] - MORETTI T R ET AL, "VALIDATION OF SHORT TANDEM REPEATS (STRS) FOR FORENSIC USAGE: PERFORMANCE TESTING OF FLUORESCENT MULTIPLEX STR SYSTEMS AND ANALYSIS OF AUTHENTIC AND SIMULATED FORENSIC SAMPLES", JOURNAL OF FORENSIC SCIENCES, CALLAGHAN AND CO, CHICAGO, IL, US, (20010501), vol. 46, no. 3, ISSN 0022-1198, pages 647 - 660, XP001203874 [A] 1-24 * abstract * * page 656, column 1, paragraph l * * page 659, column 2 * | by applicant | US4683202 | US4683195 | US4800159 | WO9010064 | US4965188 | WO9103573 | US5102784 | EP0487218 | EP0497272 | EP0512334 | US5234809 | US5333675 | WO03020739 | US6780588 | US7008771 | - WETMUR; DAVIDSON, MOL. BIOL., (1968), vol. 31, page 349 | - "Primer3 on the WWW for general users and for biologist programmers", ROZEN S; SKALETSKY H, Bioinformatics Methods and Protocols: Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2000), pages 365 - 386 | - AMPFLSTRO SGMPLUSTM PCR AMPLIFICATION KIT USER'S MANUAL, APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS, (2001), pages I - X,1-1,1- | - AMPFLSTRO IDENTIFILER® PCR AMPLIFICATION KIT USER'S MANUAL, APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS, (2001), pages I - X,1-1,1- | - BERGSTROM ET AL., ABSTR. PAP. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 206, no. 2, page 308 | - NICHOLS ET AL., NATURE, vol. 369, pages 492 - 493 | - BERGSTROM ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1995), vol. 117, pages 1201 - 1209 | - LOAKES ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4039 - 4043 | - BERGSTROM ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 1935 - 1942 | - SMITH ET AL., NUCL. NUCL., (1998), vol. 17, pages 555 - 564 | - SEELA ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1996), vol. 79, pages 488 - 498 | - SEELA ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1995), vol. 78, pages 833 - 846 | - MILLICAN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 7435 - 7453 | - MATULIC-ADAMIC ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1996), vol. 61, pages 3909 - 3911 | - LOAKES ET AL., NUCL. NUCL., (1999), vol. 18, pages 2685 - 2695 | - PAPAGEORGIOU ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA, (1987), vol. 70, pages 138 - 141 | - GIRGIS ET AL., J. HETEROCYCLE CHEM., (1988), vol. 25, pages 361 - 366 | - VAN AERSCHOT ET AL., NUCL. NUCL., (1995), vol. 14, pages 1053 - 1056 | - VAN AERSCHOT ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, pages 4363 - 4370 | - LOAKES ET AL., NUCL. NUCL., (1996), vol. 15, pages 1891 - 1904 | - GUCKIAN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1996), vol. 118, pages 8182 - 8183 | - GUCKIAN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 2213 - 2222 | - BERGER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, pages 2911 - 2914 | - BERGER ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (2000), vol. 39, pages 2940 - 2942 | - SEELA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, pages 3224 - 3232 | - BABU ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES & NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2003), vol. 22, pages 1317 - 1319 | - LOAKES, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2001), vol. 29, pages 2437 - 2447 | - WU ET AL., JACS, (2000), vol. 22, pages 7621 - 7632 | - MATTILA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 4967 | - ECKERT ET AL., PCR METHODS AND APPLICATIONS, (1991), vol. 1, page 17 | - PCR, IRL PRESS | - WALKER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 392 396 | - WALKER ET AL., NUC. ACIDS. RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 1691 - 1696 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 1874 1878 | - LIZARDI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1197 1202 | - SAIKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, page 1350 1354 | - WU ET AL., GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, page 560 569 | - BARRINGER ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 89, page 117 122 | - BARANY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 189 193 | - WALKER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1992), vol. 20, page 1691 | - WALKER ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1992), vol. 89, page 392 | - KWOH ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. US.A., (1989), vol. 86, page 1173 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1990), vol. 87, page 1874 | - LIZARDI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1197 | - LIZARDI ET AL., NAT GENET, (1998), vol. 19, page 225 232 | - LEWIS, R., GENETIC ENGINEERING NEWS, (1992), vol. 12, no. 9, page 1 | - BROWNSTEIN ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1996), vol. 20, pages 1004 - 1010 | - THOMAS, P. S., "Hybridization of Denatured RNA and Small DNA Fragments Transferred to Nitrocellulose", PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.77.9.5201, pages 5201 - 05, XP000876563 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.77.9.5201 | - SOUTHERN, "Detection of Specific Sequences Among DNA Fragments Separated by Gel Electrophoresis", J. MOL. BIOL., (1975), vol. 98, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-2836(75)80083-0, pages 503 - 17, XP000564884 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2836(75)80083-0 | - ERLICH, "Recent Advances in the Polymerase Chain Reaction", SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, doi:doi:10.1126/science.2047872, pages 1643 - 51, XP000381755 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2047872 | - HAASE ET AL., "Amplification and Detection of Lentiviral DNA Inside Cells", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 87, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.87.13.4971, pages 4971 - 5, XP000371711 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.13.4971 | - RONAGHI ET AL., "Real-time DNA sequencing using detection of pyrophosphate release", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 242, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1006/abio.1996.0432, pages 84 - 89, XP002388725 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1996.0432 | - AMPFLSTRO IDENTIFILER® PCR AMPLIFICATION KIT USER'S MANUAL, APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS, (2001), pages 1 - 3 | - H. WENZ ET AL., GENOME RES., (1998), vol. 8, pages 69 - 80 | - E. BUEL ET AL., J. FORENSIC SCL., (1998), vol. 43, no. 1, pages 164 - 170 | - M. CHRISTENSEN ET AL., SCAND. J. CLIN. LAB. INVEST., (1999), vol. 59, no. 3, pages 167 - 177 | - J. SAMBROOK ET AL., MOLECULAR CLONING: A LABORATORY MANUAL, SECOND EDITION, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), pages 13.45 - 13.57 | - GERRY ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 292, pages 251 - 62 | - DE BELLIS ET AL., MINERVA BIOTEC., (2002), vol. 14, pages 247 - 52 | - STEARS ET AL., NAT. MED., vol. 9, pages 140 - 45 | - HIGUCHI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 413 - 417 | - HIGUCHI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, pages 1026 - 1030 | US20080261506 | other | WO2008104002 |