EP2490678 - COATED CAPSULES AND TABLETS OF A FATTY ACID OIL MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF AS P.O. Box 420 1327 Lysaker / NO | [2018/51] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Pronova BioPharma Norge AS P.O. Box 420 1327 Lysaker / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLAVENESS, Jo Erik Johnsrud Midtåsen 5 N-1166 Oslo / NO | 02 /
BERGE, Gunnar Skøyenveien 5D N-0357 Oslo / NO | 03 /
HUSTVEDT, Svein Olaf Bølerveien 16 G N-0690 Oslo / NO | 04 /
OLESEN, Preben Houlberg Ørevadsvej 20 DK-2400 København NV / DK | 05 /
MÜLLERTZ, Anette Høstvej 11 DK-2920 Charlottenlund / DK | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2021/31] |
Former [2013/30] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/35] | Lillegraven, Rita, et al Zacco Norway AS Patent Department Haakon VII's gt. 2 P.O. Box 2003 Vika 0125 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 10824536.6 | 22.10.2010 | [2021/31] | WO2010IB02854 | Priority number, date | US20090254296P | 23.10.2009 Original published format: US 254296 P | US20090254291P | 23.10.2009 Original published format: US 254291 P | US20090254293P | 23.10.2009 Original published format: US 254293 P | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011048493 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2490678 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2490678 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/202, A61K31/557, A61K45/06, A61P3/00, A61P5/00, A61P9/00, A61P37/00, A23L33/12, A61K9/107, A61K9/28, A61K9/48 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
A61K9/4891 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23P10/28 (EP,US);
A23P10/30 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/557 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/107 (KR,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K9/28 (KR,US);
A61K9/2846 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2886 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/557, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/224, A23V2250/1868, A23V2250/187 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1882, A23V2250/186 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2013/18] | A61K31/202, A61K31/557, A61K45/06, A61P3/00, A61P5/00, A61P9/00, A61P37/00, A23L1/00, A23L1/30, A61K9/107, A61K9/28, A61K9/48 | ||
Former IPC [2012/35] | A61K9/48, A23L1/30, A61K31/557, A61K9/107, A61K9/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE KAPSELN UND TABLETTEN AUS EINER FETTSÄURE-ÖL-MISCHUNG | [2012/35] | English: | COATED CAPSULES AND TABLETS OF A FATTY ACID OIL MIXTURE | [2012/35] | French: | CAPSULES OU COMPRIMÉS ENROBÉS D'UN MÉLANGE OLÉAGINEUX D'ACIDES GRAS | [2012/35] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 18.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.11.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.11.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2010 | AL | 04.08.2021 | AT | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | DK | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | IT | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | MT | 04.08.2021 | NL | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SI | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | TR | 04.08.2021 | IE | 22.10.2021 | LU | 22.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.10.2010 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
TR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.10.2010 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 22.10.2010 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 22.10.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SI | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 22.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
DK | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
NL | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5502077 (BREIVIK HARALD [NO], et al) [Y] 1-49 * claims 1-12 *; | [Y]WO9929316 (SEVERSON MARY L [US], et al) [Y] 1-49 * page 8, lines 1-5 * * page 16, lines 14-17 * * page 27, lines 9-13 *; | [Y]WO9956727 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE], et al) [Y] 1-49 * page 10 - page 11 * * claim 1 * * page 36; examples 2, 3 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 25; table 11 *; | [A]EP1157692 (QUATEX NV [AN]) [A] 1-49 * claims 1-5, 21 * * paragraph [0051] *; | [Y]WO2005060954 (PRONOVA BIOCARE AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-49 * claims 1-8 * * page 29; example 5 *; | [XY]WO2005123061 (TILLOTTS PHARMA AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-10,15-26,29-32,34-37,39,49 * page 21, lines 21-31 * * page 23, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-49; | [A]WO2008002121 (HOVID BERHAD [MY], et al)[A] 1-49; | [A]WO2008113177 (CT DE RECH SUR LES BIOTECHNOLO [CA], et al) [A] 1-49 | International search | [A]US2005037065 (KIRSCHNER MITCHELL I [US], et al); | [X]WO2005123060 (TILLOTTS PHARMA AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2006024237 (MAITE SHANGHAI BIOLOG TECHNOLO [CN], et al); | [A]WO2009009040 (BAUM SETH J [US]); | [XP]WO2010103402 (PRONOVA BIOPHARMA NORGE AS [NO], et al) | by applicant | US5502077 | US5656667 | US5698594 | US6245811 | EP1157692 | US2004254357 | WO2005123061 | WO2006000229 | US7732488 |