EP2490724 - COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPROVING MIGRATION POTENTIAL OF STEM CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corestem Co., Ltd. 206, Chungcheong Business Incubation Center 330 Wolgok-Ri Gangnae-Myeon, Cheongwon-Gun Chungcheongbuk-do 363-892 / KR | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOH, Seong Ho 508-1601 Areummaeul Poonglim Apt. Imae-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-060 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seung Hyun 101-301 Banpo Apt. Banpo-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-040 / KR | 03 /
CHO, Goang Won 101-1504 Els Apt. Jamsil 2-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-222 / KR | 04 /
NOH, Min Young 102-1006 Jinro Apt. Deungchon Gangseo-gu Seoul 157-030 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Kyung Suk 201-403 Anam Apt. Myeongnyun-dong 2-ga Jongno-gu Seoul 110-522 / KR | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Krauss, Jan, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/28] | Krauss, Jan, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/24] | Scholz, Volker, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/35] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10825171.1 | 19.10.2010 | [2017/06] | WO2010KR07152 | Priority number, date | KR20090099146 | 19.10.2009 Original published format: KR 20090099146 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011049346 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2490724 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2490724 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, A61K39/12, A61K35/12, A61P25/28, A61K35/28, A61K38/00, C07K14/47 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
A61K35/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/49] | A61K48/00, A61K39/12, A61K35/12, A61P25/28, A61K35/28, A61K38/00, C07K14/47, C12Q1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/35] | A61K48/00, A61K39/12, A61K35/12, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES MIGRATIONSPOTENTIALS VON STAMMZELLEN | [2012/35] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPROVING MIGRATION POTENTIAL OF STEM CELLS | [2012/35] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR AMÉLIORER LE POTENTIEL DE MIGRATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES | [2012/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 30.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2010 | AL | 08.02.2017 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | CZ | 08.02.2017 | DK | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | ES | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | HR | 08.02.2017 | IT | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MC | 08.02.2017 | MK | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | PL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | RS | 08.02.2017 | SE | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | SM | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | NO | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | IE | 19.10.2017 | LU | 19.10.2017 | MT | 19.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.10.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.10.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.10.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.10.2010 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.10.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 19.10.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
MT | 19.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
LU | 19.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO02086122 (HYBRIGENICS SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 289 - page 290; claims 3, 6,7 * [I] 5; | [XI] - BAGRODIA S ET AL, "A novel regulator of p21-activated kinases.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19980911), vol. 273, no. 37, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 23633 - 23636, XP002714359 [X] 1-4 * page 23633, column 2, paragraph 4 * [I] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.37.23633 | [Y] - HUH ET AL, "Upregulation of -.beta-Pix expression in migrating neural stem cells in the rat brain", ABSTRACTS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE; 33RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US; NEW ORLEANS, LA,, (20031112), ISSN 0190-5295, pages 1 - 2, XP008160787 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - M. W. MAYHEW ET AL, "Identification of phosphorylation sites in betaPIX and PAK1", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (20071115), vol. 120, no. 22, doi:10.1242/jcs.008177, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 3911 - 3918, XP055082891 [Y] 1-15 * page 3911, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 3914, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.008177 | [Y] - KIM SEYUN ET AL, "Molecular cloning of neuronally expressed mouse betaPix isoforms", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (20000616), vol. 272, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 721 - 725, XP002714360 [Y] 1-15 * page 724, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/BBRC.2000.2845 | International search | [A]KR20070060721 (IND ACADEMIC COOP [KR]); | [A]KR20080049562 (CATHOLIC UNIV IND ACAD COOP [KR]) | [X] - HUH, E. ET AL., "Upregulationof J3-Pix expression in migrating neural stem cells in the rat brain.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE 33ND ANNUAL MEETING ABSTRACTS PRESENTATION NUMBER 885.9, (20031112), XP008160787 | [A] - JONES, N. P. ET AL., "Role of phospholipase C gamma 1 in cell spreading requires association with a beta -Pix/GIT1-containing complex, leading to activation of Cdc42 and Racl.", MOL. CELL BIOL., (200708), vol. 27, no. 16, pages 5790 - 5805, XP008160399 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.00778-07 | by applicant | WO02086122 | - PNAS, (1988), no. 85, page 8998 | - MAYHEW MW ET AL., JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 120, pages 3911 - 3918 | - KIM S ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS COMMUN., (20000616), vol. 272, no. 3, pages 721 - 5 | - LOCKETT U ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 3, pages 2075 - 2080 | - WANG G. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1999), vol. 104, no. 11, pages R55 - 62 | - CHAMBER R. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 1411 - 1415 | - PUHLMANN M. ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 649 - 657 | - S.C. BASU AND M. BASU, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMAN PRESS, (2002), vol. 199 | - GIMMI, E. R. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 6983 - 6998 | - SCHEK, N. ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 12, pages 5386 - 5393 | - KLASENS, B. I. F. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1998), vol. 26, pages 1870 - 1876 | - GIL, A. ET AL., CELL, (1987), vol. 49, pages 399 - 406 | - BATT, D. B.; G. G. CARMICHAEL, MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 15, pages 4783 - 4790 | - EAGLE, H., SCIENCE, (1959), vol. 130, page 432 | - STANNER, C.P. ET AL., NAT. NEW BIOL., (1971), vol. 230, page 52 | - ISCOVE, N. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1978), vol. 147, page 923 | - MORGAN ET AL., PROC. SOC. EXP. BIO. MED., (1950), vol. 73, page 1 | - MOORE ET AL., J. AMER. MED. ASSOC., (1967), vol. 199, page 519 | - HAM, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1965), vol. 53, page 288 | - HAM, R.G., EXP. CELL RES., (1963), vol. 29, page 515 | - DULBECCO, R. ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1959), vol. 8, page 396 | - BARNES, D. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 102, page 255 | - WAYMOUTH, C. J., NATL. CANCER INST., (1959), vol. 22, page 1003 | - MCCOY, T.A. ET AL., PROC. SOC. EXP. BIOL. MED., (1959), vol. 100, page 115 | - HAM, R.G. ET AL., IN VITRO, (1978), vol. 14, page 11 | - TESNIERE, C. ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL. REP., (1991), vol. 9, page 242 | - CHOMCZYNSKI, P. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 162, page 156 | - LIBERT F ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, page 569 | - GAASTRA, W., "Enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay (ELISA)", GAASTRA, W., WALKER, J.M., Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (1984), vol. 1 | - GRAZIANO, A. ET AL., "Concave pit-containing scaffold surfaces improve stem cell derived osteoblast performance and lead to significant bone tissue formation", PLOS ONE, (2007), vol. 2, no. 6, page E496 | - LAMBRECHTS, D. ET AL., "VEGF is a modifier of amyotrophic lateral sclerosis in mice and humans and protects motoneurons against ischemic death", NAT GENET, (2003), vol. 34, no. 4, page 383 | - VOLINSKY, N.; GANTMAN, A.; YABLONSKI, D., "A Pak- and Pix-dependent branch of the SDF-lalpha signalling pathway mediates T cell chemotaxis across restrictive barriers", BIOCHEM J, (2006), vol. 397, no. 1, page 213 | - TEN KLOOSTER, J. P.; JAFFER, Z. M.; CHERNOFF, J.; HORDIJK, P. L., "Targeting and activation of Racl are mediated by the exchange factor beta-Pix", J CELL BIOL, (2006), vol. 172, no. 5, page 759 | - SHIN, E. Y. ET AL., "Phosphorylation of p85 beta PIX, a Rac/Cdc42-specific guanine nucleotide exchange factor, via the Ras/ERK/PAK2 pathway is required for basic fibroblast growth factor-induced neurite outgrowth", J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, no. 46, page 44417 | - MAZZINI, L. ET AL., "Stem cell treatment in Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis", J NEUROL SCI, (2008), vol. 265, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jns.2007.05.016, page 78, XP022419429 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jns.2007.05.016 | - KIM, H.Y. ET AL., "Efficacy and Safety of Autologous Bone Marrow-derived Mesenchymal Stem Cell Treatment in Patients with Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis", J KOREAN NEUROL ASSOC, (2009), vol. 27, no. 2, page 163 | - KOH, S. H. ET AL., "Implantation of human umbilical cord-derived mesenchymal stem cells as a neuroprotective therapy for ischemic stroke in rats", BRAIN RES, (2008), vol. 1229, doi:doi:10.1016/j.brainres.2008.06.087, page 233, XP024099734 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2008.06.087 | - OMURA, T. ET AL., "Effect of a new inhibitor of the synthesis of 20-HETE on cerebral ischemia reperfusion injury", STROKE, (2006), vol. 37, no. 5, page 1307 | - KO, I. K. ET AL., "In vivo MR imaging of tissue-engineered human mesenchymal stem cells transplanted to mouse: a preliminary study", ANN BIOMED ENG, (2007), vol. 35, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1007/s10439-006-9204-7, page 101, XP019446490 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10439-006-9204-7 | - ARBAB, A. S. ET AL., "Efficient magnetic cell labeling with protamine sulfate complexed to ferumoxides for cellular MRI", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 104, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2004-02-0655, page 1217, XP055227705 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2004-02-0655 |