Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011021852 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2011 | A3 | WO2011021852 | 24.02.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9712360 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2017 | B2 | US2016248614 | 25.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US201213503740 | 24.04.2012 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010KR07274 | 22.10.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US201414313848 | 24.06.2014 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US201514738519 | 12.06.2015 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US201615145646 | 03.05.2016 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9356682 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2016 | B2 | US2015280809 | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US201213503740 | 24.04.2012 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010KR07274 | 22.10.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US201414313848 | 24.06.2014 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US201514738519 | 12.06.2015 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9853785 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2015139138 | 21.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US201213391193 | 17.02.2012 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | WO2010KR05466 | 18.08.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US201414582482 | 24.12.2014 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9083435 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2015 | B2 | US2014313970 | 23.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US201213503740 | 24.04.2012 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010KR07274 | 22.10.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US201414313848 | 24.06.2014 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8787245 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2014 | B2 | US2012207084 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010KR07274 | 22.10.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US201013503740 | 22.10.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8942322 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2015 | B2 | US2012155561 | 21.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201013391193 | 18.08.2010 | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | WO2010KR05466 | 18.08.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101761515B | Global Dossier | 26.07.2017 | B1 | KR20160088837 | 26.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101641388B | Global Dossier | 21.07.2016 | B1 | KR20110019330 | 25.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5551261B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2014 | B2 | JP2013509127 | 07.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010KR07274 | 22.10.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5281200B | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | B2 | JP2013502812 | 24.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | WO2010KR05466 | 18.08.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3439197 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | EP10810160 | 18.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | WO2010KR05466 | 18.08.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2467951 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B1 | EP2467951 | 15.03.2017 | A4 | EP2467951 | 27.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | WO2010KR05466 | 18.08.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105391484 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | CN201080048233 | 22.10.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104579449B | Global Dossier | 16.02.2018 | B | CN104579449 | 29.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | CN201080041466 | 18.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102668409B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2015 | B | CN102668409 | 12.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010KR07274 | 22.10.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102625978B | Global Dossier | 22.04.2015 | B | CN102625978 | 01.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | WO2010KR05466 | 18.08.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2778768 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2016 | C | CA2778768 | 28.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010KR07274 | 22.10.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2771603 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2015 | C | CA2771603 | 24.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US23532209 | 19.08.2009 | WO2010KR05466 | 18.08.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2493092 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2018 | B1 | EP2493092 | 15.03.2017 | A4 | EP2493092 | 29.08.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | WO2010KR07274 | 22.10.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011049401 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2011 | A3 | WO2011049401 | 28.04.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5719060B | Global Dossier | 13.05.2015 | B2 | JP2014207678 | 30.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US25474409 | 25.10.2009 | US32281610 | 09.04.2010 | KR20100076740 | 10.08.2010 | US25627209 | 29.10.2009 | US30740910 | 23.02.2010 | US32290810 | 11.04.2010 | US35751310 | 22.06.2010 | US33458210 | 14.05.2010 | US32535310 | 18.04.2010 |