EP2480847 - HYDROCARBON GAS PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | [2017/40] |
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states Ortloff Engineers, Ltd 415 W. Wall, Suite 2000 Dallas, TX 79701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ, Tony, L. 2303 Bellechasse Court Midland, TX 79705 / US | 02 /
WILKINSON, John, D. 4113 Tanforan Avenue Midland, TX 79707 / US | 03 /
LYNCH, Joe, T. 5510 Ashwood Ct. Midland, TX 79707 / US | 04 /
HUDSON, Hank, M. 2508 W. Sinclair Avenue Midland, TX 79705 / US | 05 /
CUELLAR, Kyle, T 1611 Cottage Point Drive Katy, TX 77494 / US | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Nemec, Harald Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 10825365.9 | 27.08.2010 | WO2010US46967 | Priority number, date | US20090244181P | 21.09.2009 Original published format: US 244181 P | US20100346150P | 19.05.2010 Original published format: US 346150 P | US20100351045P | 03.06.2010 Original published format: US 351045 P | US20100868993 | 26.08.2010 Original published format: US 868993 | US20100869139 | 26.08.2010 Original published format: US 869139 | US20100869007 | 26.08.2010 Original published format: US 869007 | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011049672 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2480847 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/00, F25J3/02 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
F25J3/0209 (EP,KR,US);
F25J3/0233 (EP,KR,US);
F25J3/0238 (EP,KR,US);
F25J5/00 (KR);
F25J2200/02 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2200/30 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2200/74 (US);
F25J2200/76 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2200/78 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2200/90 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2200/92 (US);
F25J2200/94 (EP,US);
F25J2205/04 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2210/06 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2210/60 (US);
F25J2215/60 (US);
F25J2230/08 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2235/60 (US);
F25J2240/02 (EP,US);
F25J2240/40 (US);
F25J2270/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/31] | F25J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFGAS | [2012/31] | English: | HYDROCARBON GAS PROCESSING | [2012/31] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'HYDROCARBURE GAZEUX | [2012/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 26.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2016 | 31.08.2020 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0776685 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,11,12,15 * figures 2, 4 * * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 40 *; | [Y]US2008190136 (PITMAN RICHARD N [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,11,12,15 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0076] * * table V *; | [A] - WILKINSON J ET AL, "Next Generation Processes for NGL / LPG Recovery", GPA ANNUAL CONFER,, (20020901), pages 1 - 12, XP007912220 [A] 1,3,5,11,12,15 * figures 1, 3, 8 * * page 2, paragraph 4th paragraph * * page 3, paragraph 2nd paragraph * * page 5, paragraph 3rd and 4th paragraphs * | International search | [A]US5983664 (CAMPBELL ROY E [US], et al); | [A]US6945075 (WILKINSON JOHN D [US], et al); | [A]US2006283207 (PITMAN RICHARD N [US], et al); | [A]US2008028790 (WILKINSON JOHN D [US], et al); | [A]US2008078205 (CUELLAR KYLE T [US], et al) |