EP2493478 - CONCENTRATED THERAPEUTIC PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acasti Pharma, Inc. 545 Promenade du Centropolis, Suite 100 Laval, Quebec H7T 0A3 / CA | [2018/11] |
Former [2018/08] | For all designated states Acasti Pharma, Inc. 225 Promenade Du Centropolis Suite 200 Laval, Quebec H7T 0B3 / CA | ||
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Acasti Pharma, Inc. 225 Promenade Du Centropolis Suite 200 Laval, Quebec H7T 0B3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMPALIS, Fotini 1348 Elizabeth Boulevard Laval Quebec H7W 3J8 / CA | 02 /
HARLAND, Henri 139 rue Ducharme Rosemere Quebec J7A 4H8 / CA | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Nikolaistrasse 15 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/04] | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Nikolaistrasse 15 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/36] | Wills, Andrew Jonathan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10825905.2 | 29.10.2010 | [2018/08] | WO2010CA01720 | Priority number, date | US20090256106P | 29.10.2009 Original published format: US 256106 P | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011050474 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2493478 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2493478 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2493478 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/683, A61P3/00, A61P9/00 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/685 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/19 (IL,KR,RU);
A61K31/683 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
A61K31/07 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/23 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P19/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P21/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/14 (EP,IL);
A61P25/16 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/22 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P3/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P3/08 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P5/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P7/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL,RU);
A61P9/04 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/07, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/122, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/683, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONZENTRIERTE THERAPEUTISCHE PHOSPHOLIPID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2012/36] | English: | CONCENTRATED THERAPEUTIC PHOSPHOLIPID COMPOSITIONS | [2012/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE PHOSPHOLIPIDES THÉRAPEUTIQUES CONCENTRÉES | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 22.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2016 | Observations by third parties | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18152030.5 / EP3335713 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2010 | AL | 21.02.2018 | AT | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | HR | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | MK | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | RS | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | SM | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | IE | 29.10.2018 | LU | 29.10.2018 | MT | 29.10.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MK | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9739759 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al); | [Y]JPH10155459 (SUNTORY LTD, et al); | [Y]WO03072111 (STOLL ANDREW [US]); | [Y]WO2005011712 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al); | [Y]WO2005037848 (ENZYMOTEC LTD [IL], et al); | [Y]US2009118227 (JOUNI ZEINA [US], et al); | [Y]EP2085089 (KTB TUMORFORSCHUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [YP]WO2010109330 (UNIV OXFORD [GB], et al) | International search | [X]JPH02215351 (TAIYO FISHERY CO LTD); | [X]JP2000060432 (NIPPON KAGAKU SHIRYO KK); | [X]WO0023546 (UNIV SHERBROOKE [CA], et al); | [A]WO02102394 (NEPTUNE TECHNOLOGIES & BIORESS [CA], et al); | [X]WO03011873 (NEPTUNE TECHNOLOGIES & BIORESS [CA], et al); | [X]WO2008060163 (PRONOVA BIOPHARMA NORGE AS [NO], et al); | [X]WO2008117062 (AKER BIOMARINE ASA [NO], et al) | Examination | GB2290965 | WO2011137160 | by applicant | WO9739759 | JPH10155459 | WO0023546 | WO02102394 | WO03011873 | WO03072111 | US2004234587 | WO2005011712 | WO2005037848 | US7034168 | WO2008117062 | US2008274203 | US2009074857 | US2009118227 | EP2085089 |