|
04.07.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.05.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.04.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.04.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.04.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.04.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.04.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.03.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.03.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Translation of description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Translation of drawings |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Translation of the abstract |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Translation of the claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.05.2011 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
15 |