EP2495036 - BIOMASS PRE-TREATMENT METHOD AND INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HRS Investments Limited HRS House, 10/12 Caxton Way Watford Business Park Watford Hertfordshire WD18UA / GB | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIJN, Aart, Berthold Avda. Miguel de Cervantes 45 - Edificio Torre Expomurcia 3ª pl. 30009 Murcia / ES | [2017/35] |
Former [2012/36] | 01 /
KLEIJN, Aart, Berthold Avda. Miguel de Cervantes 45 - Edificio Torre Expomurcia 3ª pl. E-30009 Murcia / ES | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros 1 28014 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2012/36] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10826139.7 | 14.04.2010 | [2017/35] | WO2010ES70226 | Priority number, date | ES20090030913 | 27.10.2009 Original published format: ES 200930913 | [2012/36] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011051518 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | ES | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2495036 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2495036 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J3/00, C02F1/02, C02F11/18, C13K1/02 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
C10L5/44 (EP,US);
B01J3/00 (ES);
B01J19/24 (US);
C02F1/025 (ES);
C02F11/18 (ES);
C10L9/086 (EP,US);
C12M45/06 (EP,US);
C12M45/20 (EP,US);
C13K1/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR VORBEARBEITUNG VON BIOMASSE | [2012/36] | English: | BIOMASS PRE-TREATMENT METHOD AND INSTALLATION | [2012/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION POUR LE PRÉTRAITEMENT DE BIOMASSE | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2012 | Translation filed | 28.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 16.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2010 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | HR | 30.08.2017 | IT | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | MK | 30.08.2017 | NL | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | SM | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | NO | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | IE | 14.04.2018 | LU | 14.04.2018 | MT | 14.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.04.2010 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.04.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
MT | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.04.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
MT | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.04.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
MT | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.04.2018 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | |
NO | 30.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0617897 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]); | [A]WO9424316 (REGALCO AB [SE], et al); | [A]US5411594 (BRELSFORD DONALD L [US]); | [Y]WO0073221 (CAMBI AS [NO], et al); | [Y]WO2006034590 (IOGEN ENERGY CORP [CA], et al); | International search | [A]ES2054996T (STILL OTTO GMBH); | [A]WO9424316 (REGALCO AB [SE], et al); | [A]ES2158752 (HRS SPIRATUBE S L [ES]); | [A]ES2228530T (CAMBI AS); | [A]WO2008026932 (CAMBI AS [NO], et al); | by applicant | WO9609882 |