EP2495568 - Method for determining sensitivity to an anticancer agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keio University 15-45 Mita 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8345 / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashi-Shinbashi, 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | [2018/33] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Keio University 15-45 Mita 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8345 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashi Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanigawara, Yusuke c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35, Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Sayo c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35, Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 03 /
Irie, Hidehiro c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35, Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 04 /
Nishimuta, Akito c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35, Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 05 /
Suzuki, Tetsuya c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35, Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | 06 /
Sugimoto, Shinji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19, Higashi-Shinbashi, 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | [2018/33] |
Former [2012/36] | 01 /
Tanigawara, Yusuke c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Sayo c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
03 /
Irie, Hidehiro c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
04 /
Nishimuta, Akito c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
05 /
Suzuki, Tetsuya c/o School of Medicine Keio University 35 Shinanomachi Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8582 / JP | |||
06 /
Sugimoto, Shinji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Yakult Honsha 1-19 Higashi Shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8660 / JP | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2018/34] |
Former [2012/36] | Blodig, Wolfgang, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10826878.0 | 29.10.2010 | [2018/34] | WO2010JP69362 | Priority number, date | JP20090250257 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009250257 | JP20100020456 | 01.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010020456 | [2012/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011052748 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2495568 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2495568 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4745, A61K31/513, A61K45/06, G01N33/574 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4745, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/36] | G01N33/68, A61K31/4745, A61K31/513, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, G01N27/62, G01N33/15, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER EMPFINDLICHKEIT FÜR EIN ANTIKREBSMITTEL | [2012/36] | English: | Method for determining sensitivity to an anticancer agent | [2012/36] | French: | Procédé de détermination de la sensibilité à un agent anticancéreux | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2012 | Translation filed | 24.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 01.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2010 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | PT | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | IE | 29.10.2018 | LU | 29.10.2018 | MT | 29.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AL | 22.08.2018 | ||
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
MT | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 29.10.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007002069 (GONCALVES ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-35 * * table 1 *; | [X]WO2007071914 (CYCLACEL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-29 * * example 1 *; | [X] - EUN-KYOUNG YIM ET AL, "Proteomic analysis of antiproliferative effects by treatment of 5-fluorouracil in cervical cancer cells.", DNA AND CELL BIOLOGY, (20041101), vol. 23, no. 11, doi:10.1089/1044549042531404, ISSN 1044-5498, pages 769 - 776, XP055055064 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/dna.2004.23.769 | [X] - LAJOS PUSZTAI ET AL, "Pharmacoproteomic analysis of prechemotherapy and postchemotherapy plasma samples from patients receiving neoadjuvant or adjuvant chemotherapy for breast carcinoma", CANCER, (20040501), vol. 100, no. 9, doi:10.1002/cncr.20203, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 1814 - 1822, XP055055068 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.20203 | International search | [X]WO2009096196 (UNIV KEIO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2009096189 (UNIV KEIO [JP], et al); | [A] - KOICHI TAKAGI ET AL., "CDK inhibitor enhances the sensitivity to 5-FU in colorectal cancer cells", 66TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE JAPAN CANCER ASSOCIATION KOEN YOSHISHU, page 45 0-023, XP008156454 | by applicant | - J. CLIN. ONCOL., (1993), vol. 11, pages 909 - 913 | - SEMIN. ONCOL., (1999), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 6 - 12 | - LANCET, (1998), vol. 352, pages 1407 - 1412 | - N. ENGL. J. MED., (2000), vol. 343, pages 905 - 914 | - LANCET, (2000), vol. 355, pages 1041 - 1047 | - CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, pages 4187 - 4191 | - CLIN. CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 11, pages 6901 - 6907 | - PHARMACOGENET GENOMICS, (2007), vol. 17, pages 1 - 10 | - NAT. MED., (2006), vol. 12, pages 1294 - 1300 | - CLIN. CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, pages 4117 - 4122 | - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2004), vol. 40, pages 939 - 950 | - CANCER TREATMENT REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 28, pages 27 - 47 | - J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2004), vol. 22, pages 529 - 536 | - INT. J. CANCER, (2004), vol. 111, pages 252 - 258 |