EP2495318 - PROBE FOR DETECTING MPL GENE POLYMORPHISM AND USE OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKRAY, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Arkray, Inc. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAI Mitsuharu c/o ARKRAY, Inc. Yousuien-nai, 59, Gansuin-cho Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-0008 / JP | 02 /
KOMORI Mariko c/o ARKRAY, Inc. Yousuien-nai, 59, Gansuin-cho Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-0008 / JP | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Jones, Elizabeth Louise, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Jones, Elizabeth Louise, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10826885.5 | 29.10.2010 | WO2010JP69379 | Priority number, date | JP20090251429 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009251429 | [2012/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011052755 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2495318 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/00, C12N15/09 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | SONDE ZUR ERKENNUNG VON POLYMORPHISMEN DES MPL-GENS UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2012/36] | English: | PROBE FOR DETECTING MPL GENE POLYMORPHISM AND USE OF THE SAME | [2012/36] | French: | SONDE POUR LA DÉTECTION DE POLYMORPHISME DU GÈNE MPL ET SON UTILISATION | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2012 | Translation filed | 29.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 10.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008070370 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * example 2 * * abstract ** the whole document *; | [XI]WO2009072084 (UNIV FIRENZE [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,6-14,20,21 * sequences 4,5 * * page 14, lines 5-6 * * page 15, line 23 - page 16, line 3 * * page 18, line 30 - line 32 * * abstract * * the whole document * [I] 4,5,15-19; | [A] - M. GHADERI ET AL, "Rapid real-time PCR assay for detection of MPL W515L mutation in patients with chronic myeloproliferative disorders", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF LABORATORY HEMATOLOGY, (20081110), vol. 32, no. 1p2, doi:10.1111/j.1751-553X.2008.01118.x, ISSN 1751-5521, pages 122 - 126, XP055061379 [A] 1-21 * table 1 * * abstract * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1751-553X.2008.01118.x | International search | [Y]WO2008084672 (ARKRAY INC [JP], et al); | [A]CN101403009 (PEOPLE S HOSPITAL OF BEIJING [CN]); | [X]WO2009072084 (UNIV FIRENZE [IT], et al); | [Y] - KAZUTAKA NAKAYAMA ET AL., "Kotsuzui Zoshokusei Shuyo ni Okeru JAK2 exon12 no Hen'i to c- MPLW515L/K Hen'i no Shinki Kenshutsuho no Kaihatsu", RINSHO KETSUEKI, (20090930), vol. 50, no. 9, page 939 | [Y] - PARDANANI, A., D. ET AL., "MPL515 mutations in myeloproliferative and other myeloid disorders: a study of 1182 patients", BLOOD, (2006), vol. 108, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2006-04-018879, pages 3472 - 3476, XP009117093 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2006-04-018879 | [XP] - RUAN, G., R. ET AL., "MPL W515L/K mutations in 343 Chinese adults with JAK2V617F mutation- negative chronic myeloproliferative disorders detected by a newly developed RQ-PCR based on TaqMan MGB probes", HEMATOL. ONCOL., (2010), vol. 28, pages 33 - 39 | by applicant | US4889818 | WO9109950 | EP0455430 | US5079352 | WO9209689 | JP2009251429 | - PARADANANI ET AL., BLOOD, (2006), vol. 108, no. 10, pages 3472 - 3476 |