EP2495260 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR PROPYLENE POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Polypropylene Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI Yoshitaka c/o Japan Polypropylene Corporation Polymerization Technical Center 5-1, Goi-kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
NAKASHIMA Takanori c/o Japan Polypropylene Corporation Polymerization Technical Center 5-1, Goi-kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 03 /
YUKAWA Kiyoshi c/o Japan Polypropylene Corporation Polymerization Technical Center 5-1, Goi-kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 04 /
YAMADA Yusuke c/o Japan Polypropylene Corporation Polymerization Technical Center 5-1, Goi-kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 05 /
AOYAMA Hajime c/o Japan Polypropylene Corporation Polymerization Technical Center 5-1, Goi-kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 06 /
IWAI Nobuhiro c/o Japan Polypropylene Corporation Polymerization Technical Center 5-1, Goi-kaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/43] |
Former [2012/36] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10826887.1 | 29.10.2010 | [2018/43] | WO2010JP69381 | Priority number, date | JP20090249568 | 29.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009249568 | JP20090296556 | 27.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009296556 | JP20090299307 | 31.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009299307 | [2012/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011052757 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2495260 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2495260 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2495260 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/34, C08F4/64, C08F10/06 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
C08F10/06 (EP,US);
B01J8/226 (EP,US);
B01J8/228 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00274 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00283 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00198 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00202 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0022 (EP,US);
B01J2219/182 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/06, C08F2/01 (US,EP);
C08F10/06, C08F2/34 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/24 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN PROPYLENPOLYMER | [2012/36] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR PROPYLENE POLYMER | [2012/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE POLYMÈRE DE PROPYLÈNE | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2012 | Translation filed | 27.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 02.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE INEOS Europe AG Avenue des Uttins 3 Rolle CH-1180 Vaud / CH Opponent's representative King, Alex Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.2015
ADMISSIBLE INEOS Europe AG Avenue des Uttins 3 Rolle CH-1180 Vaud / CH Opponent's representative King, Alex Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB | 10.04.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.10.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.05.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.05.2017 | 24.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.12.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.12.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.06.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2010 | AL | 04.06.2014 | AT | 04.06.2014 | BE | 04.06.2014 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | HR | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | MK | 04.06.2014 | MT | 04.06.2014 | NL | 04.06.2014 | PL | 04.06.2014 | RO | 04.06.2014 | RS | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | SM | 04.06.2014 | TR | 04.06.2014 | NO | 04.09.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | GB | 29.10.2014 | IE | 29.10.2014 | LU | 29.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | FR | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MK | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
GB | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
GB | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
GB | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
GB | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
GB | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
GB | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
GB | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
GB | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 29.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2009073890 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP) [X] 1,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0009] , [0011] , [0003] , [0015] , [0018] , [0021] , [0024] , [0025] * [I] 2-4,6,9-11; | [A]EP1197497 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1980576 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007231257 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2008120842 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP); | [A]JP2008115321 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP); | [A]JP2009073890 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP); | [A]JPH07504708 (AMOCO CORP.); | [A]WO2007088887 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | US3971768 | JPH0794485B | WO0042081 | JPH01120941 | JP3180305B | JP2000264918 | JPH06319920 | JPH05304568 | JPS543894 | JPS54131589 | JPS5575411 | JPS55155003 | JPS5618609 | JPS56155206 | JPS573803 | JPS57121003 | JPS585309 | JPS58183709 | JPH06310800 | JPH06326460 | JPS6479203 | JPH0198603 | JPH07258328 | JPH08269125 | JPH01102130 | JP2004124090 | JPH03234709 | JPH05247128 | JPH01226712 | JPS6422671 | JP2009249568 | JP2009296556 | JP2009299307 | - Kagaku Kogaku Binran, MARUZEN CO., LTD., page 485 | - MACROMOLECULES, (1984), vol. 17, page 1950 | - CARMAN ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (1977), vol. 10, page 536 | - MACROMOLECULES, (1982), vol. 15, page 1150 | - MACROMOLECULES, (1982), page 1150 | Opposition | US3965083 |