EP2495965 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING INSERTED WATERMARKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/36] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INSERTING WATERMARKS IN CONTENTS AND FOR DETECTING INSERTED WATERMARKS | ||
[2019/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2020/16] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Ingu LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-Dong Seocho-Gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Sungwook LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-Dong Seocho-Gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jongchan LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-Dong Seocho-Gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | 04 /
OH, Seungkyun LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-Dong Seocho-Gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | 05 /
IM, Jinseok LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-Dong Seocho-Gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | 06 /
LIM, Jungeun LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 16 Woomyeon-Dong Seocho-Gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/36] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10827076.0 | 27.10.2010 | [2020/16] | WO2010KR07425 | Priority number, date | US20090255856P | 29.10.2009 Original published format: US 255856 P | US20090261757P | 17.11.2009 Original published format: US 261757 P | KR20100022472 | 12.03.2010 Original published format: KR 20100022472 | KR20100022471 | 12.03.2010 Original published format: KR 20100022471 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/36] | US20090255856P | 29.10.2009 | |
US20090261757P | 17.11.2009 | ||
KR20100022472 | 12.03.2010 | ||
KR20100002471 | 12.03.2010 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011052992 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2495965 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2495965 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/913, G06T1/00, H04N21/254, H04N21/44, H04N21/835, H04N21/8358 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
H04N21/835 (EP,US);
G06T1/0085 (EP,US);
H04N21/2541 (EP,US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/8358 (EP,US);
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | H04N5/913 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINGESETZTER WASSERZEICHEN | [2019/45] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING INSERTED WATERMARKS | [2019/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE POUR LA DÉTECTION DE FILIGRANES INSÉRÉS | [2019/49] |
Former [2012/36] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSETZUNG VON WASSERZEICHEN IN INHALTE UND ZUR ERKENNUNG EINGESETZTER WASSERZEICHEN | ||
Former [2012/36] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INSERTING WATERMARKS IN CONTENTS AND FOR DETECTING INSERTED WATERMARKS | ||
Former [2012/36] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSERTION DE FILIGRANES DANS DES CONTENUS ET DE DÉTECTION DE FILIGRANES INSÉRÉS | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2012 | Translation filed | 30.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 08.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2010 | AL | 15.04.2020 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | IT | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | RS | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | GB | 27.10.2020 | IE | 27.10.2020 | LU | 27.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | FR | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.10.2010 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 27.10.2020 | ||
IE | 27.10.2020 | ||
LU | 27.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 27.10.2020 | ||
IE | 27.10.2020 | ||
LU | 27.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 27.10.2020 | ||
IE | 27.10.2020 | ||
LU | 27.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 27.10.2020 | ||
LU | 27.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 27.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 27.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 27.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
LU | 27.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1229725 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0067] ** figures 1-12 *; | [IA]US2002159614 (BRADLEY BRETT ALAN [US], et al) [I] 1-3,9-12,15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0109] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 4-8,13,14; | [A]US2004263911 (RODRIGUEZ TONY F [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0215] * * figures 1-12 * | International search | [A]KR20020053980 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]KR20030065094 (LINK HOUSE DCO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20050002545 (KT CORP) |