EP2496010 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING CONTROL AND TRAINING SYMBOLS IN MULTI-USER WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-350 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161 Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-350 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Yu-Ro 403-1201 Daedeok Techno Valley Apt. Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-509 / KR | 02 /
SON, Jung-Bo 209-1303 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Sok-Kyu 506-1002 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-762 / KR | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10827154.5 | 30.10.2010 | WO2010KR07574 | Priority number, date | KR20090104616 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: KR 20090104616 | KR20100013612 | 12.02.2010 Original published format: KR 20100013612 | [2012/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011053070 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2496010 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/06, H04B7/04, H04L5/00, H04W48/08, H04W84/12 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
H04L1/007 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/0028 (KR);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04B7/0452 (CN,US);
H04L1/0003 (KR);
H04L1/0007 (KR);
H04L1/0606 (US);
H04L1/0612 (US);
H04L1/08 (KR);
H04L5/0023 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0073 (EP,CN,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,CN,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/0072 (EP,CN,US);
H04W28/04 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (EP,CN,US);
H04W28/22 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | H04W28/06, H04B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON STEUERUNGS- UND TRAININGSSYMBOLEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN MEHRBENUTZER-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2012/36] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING CONTROL AND TRAINING SYMBOLS IN MULTI-USER WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2012/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SYMBOLES DE COMMANDE ET D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL MULTI-UTILISATEUR | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2012 | Translation filed | 30.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2012 | Search fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 29.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 19.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/37] | Divisional application(s) | EP16177778.4 / EP3107329 | EP20164185.9 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006193340 (JONES VINCENT K [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] *; | [XP]WO2010120692 (MARVELL WORLD TRADE LTD [BB], et al) [XP] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0125] *; | [A] - "Draft Standard for Information Technology Telecommunications and information exchange between systems. Local and metropolitan area networks. Specific requirements. Part 11: Wireless LAN Medium Access Control (MAC) and Physical Layer (PHY) specifications:Amendment 5:Enhancements for Higher Throughput", pages 1,2,276 - 297, IEEE P802.11N/D9.0, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stamp/stamp.jsp?tp=&arnumber=4810960, (20101025), XP002606795 [A] 1-15 * 20.3.9. HT preamble * | International search | [A]KR20090076966 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]KR20090079480 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20090105299 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]KR20090110114 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |