EP2494006 - METHODS FOR PRODUCING HYDROCARBON PRODUCTS FROM BIO-OILS AND/OR COAL -OILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ignite Resources Pty Ltd Level 3 90 Mount Street North Sydney, NSW / AU | For all designated states Licella Pty Limited Level 3 90 Mount Street North Sydney, NSW / AU | For all designated states Licella Fibre Fuels Pty Ltd 56 Gindurra Road Somersby, NSW / AU | [2016/42] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states Ignite Resources Pty Ltd Level 3, 90 Mount Street North Sydney, New South Wales / AU | ||
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Ignite Energy Resources Limited 56 Gindurra Road Somersby, NSW 2250 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAXWELL, Ian Ernest 81 Sunnybrae Road Hillcrest Auckland 0627 / NZ | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Höglund, Lars Albihns.Zacco AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10827206.3 | 27.10.2010 | WO2010NZ00215 | Priority number, date | NZ20090580653 | 27.10.2009 Original published format: NZ 58065309 | NZ20090580654 | 27.10.2009 Original published format: NZ 58065409 | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011053166 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2494006 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C10G3/00, C10G1/00 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
C10G1/02 (EP,US);
C10G1/002 (US);
C10G1/06 (EP,US);
C10G1/10 (EP,US);
C10G11/00 (EP,US);
C10G11/18 (EP,US);
C10G3/42 (EP,US);
C10G3/46 (EP,US);
C10G3/50 (EP,US);
C10G45/02 (EP,US);
C10G45/06 (EP,US);
C10G45/08 (EP,US);
C10G45/12 (EP,US);
C10G69/04 (EP,US);
C10G9/36 (EP,US);
C10L1/06 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1011 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1014 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1085 (EP,US);
C10G2300/201 (EP,US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/42 (EP,US);
C10G2300/807 (EP,US);
C10G2400/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFPRODUKTEN AUS BIOÖLEN UND/ODER KOHLEÖLEN | [2012/36] | English: | METHODS FOR PRODUCING HYDROCARBON PRODUCTS FROM BIO-OILS AND/OR COAL -OILS | [2012/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR PRODUIRE DES PRODUITS HYDROCARBONÉS À PARTIR DE BIO-HUILES ET/OU D'HUILES LOURDES DE CHARBON | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 15.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 17.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/not-exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | Canfor Pulp Ltd 230-1700 West 75th Avenue Vancouver, BC V6P 6G2 / CA | Date: | 02.09.2016 | [2018/25] |
Former [2012/36] | deleted | ||
[2018/25] | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | FI SE | Date: | 31.08.2016 | [2016/51] |
Former [2016/49] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 31.08.2016 | ||
[2016/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2163776 (CHEVRON RES) [X] 2-15 * page 2, lines 18-19 * * page 3, line 90 - page 4, line 23 ** claim 24 * | International search | [X]US4409092 (JOHNSON CHARLES A [US], et al); | [X]GB2132222 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [X]US5233109 (CHOW PENG W [SG]); | [X]US2007015947 (MARKER TERRY L [US]); | [X]CN101343552 (DAPENG REN [CN]); | [X]US2009229173 (GOSLING CHRISTOPHER D [US]); | [X] - OOI, Y.S. ET AL., "Catalytic conversion of palm oil-based fatty acid mixture to liquid fuel", BIOMASS AND BIOENERGY, (2004), vol. 27, pages 477 - 484, XP008156704 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biombioe.2004.03.003 |