|
10.04.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.04.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.04.2023 |
Request for delayed grant (upcoming introduction of UPP) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2022 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.12.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
21.12.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
11.06.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Brief communication to third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Extension of time limit granted |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2017 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
41 |