EP2494059 - USE OF METHYLSULFONYLMETHANE (MSM) TO MODULATE MICROBIAL ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogenic Innovations, Llc 1000 West 8th Street Vancouver, WA 98660 / US | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENJAMIN, Rodney L. 28705 NE 53rd Street Camas WA 98607 / US | 02 /
VARELMAN, Jeffrey 731 Bonner Lake Road Moyie Springs ID 83845 / US | 03 /
KELLER, Anthony L. 1577 N. Valley View Road Ashland OR 97520 / US | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2012/36] | King, Hilary Mary Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10827570.2 | 29.10.2010 | [2016/47] | WO2010US54845 | Priority number, date | US20100294437P | 12.01.2010 Original published format: US 294437 P | US20090257751P | 03.11.2009 Original published format: US 257751 P | US20090256935P | 30.10.2009 Original published format: US 256935 P | US20090259098P | 06.11.2009 Original published format: US 259098 P | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011053854 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2494059 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2494059 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/06, C12G1/00, C12P7/56, C12C11/00, C12G3/10, C12Q1/02, C12N1/38, C12N1/20, C12N1/18 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
C12N1/38 (EP,KR,US);
A01N41/10 (KR,US);
A61K31/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/43 (EP,US);
A61K31/431 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N1/18 (EP,KR,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,KR,US);
C12P7/06 (EP,KR,US);
C12P7/56 (EP,KR,US);
Y02A50/30 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/431, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/43, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2013/49] | C12P7/06, C12G1/00, C12P7/56, C12C11/00, C12G3/10, C12Q1/02, A23L1/00, C12N1/38, C12N1/20, C12N1/18 | ||
Former IPC [2012/36] | C12P7/06, C12G1/00, C12P7/56, C12C11/00, C12G3/10, C12Q1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON METHYLSULFONYLMETHAN (MSM) ZUR MODULIERUNG EINER MIKROBIELLEN AKTIVITÄT | [2012/36] | English: | USE OF METHYLSULFONYLMETHANE (MSM) TO MODULATE MICROBIAL ACTIVITY | [2012/36] | French: | UTILISATION DE MÉTHYSULFONYLMÉTHANE (MSM) À DES FINS DE MODULATION DE L'ACTIVITÉ MICROBIENNE | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 16.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2010 | AL | 23.11.2016 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | RS | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0173096 (CUBIST PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4559329 (HERSCHLER ROBERT J [US]); | [X]WO2004067013 (FLORA TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2006129149 (WOCKHARDT LTD [IN], et al); | [X] - BORODINA E. ET AL., "Dimethylsultone as a growth substrate tor novel methylotrophic species of Hyphomicrobium and Arthrobacter.", ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 173, pages 425 - 437, XP008156320 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/1O.1007/s002030000165 |