EP2493723 - LED LIGHTING FOR LIVESTOCK DEVELOPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify North America Corporation 200 Franklin Square Drive Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Once Innovations, Inc. 15255 23rd Avenue N Plymouth, Minnesota 55447 / US | ||
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Once Innovations, Inc. 5455 Highway 169 North Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | ||
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Once Innovations, Inc. 5455 Highway 169 North Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | ||
For all designated states Grajcar, Zdenko 3220 Utah Avenue North Crystal, MN 55427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAJCAR, Zdenko 3220 Utah Avenue North Crystal, Minnesota 55427 / US | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/37] |
Former [2012/36] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10827580.1 | 29.10.2010 | [2021/37] | WO2010US54869 | Priority number, date | US20090255855P | 29.10.2009 Original published format: US 255855 P | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011053873 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2493723 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2493723 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B45/20, H05B33/08, A01K1/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
A01K29/00 (EP,US);
A01K45/00 (EP,US);
F21S8/06 (EP,US);
F21V29/773 (EP,US);
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
H05B45/31 (EP,US);
H05B45/40 (EP,US);
H05B45/48 (EP,US);
A01K1/0088 (US);
A01K2227/108 (US);
F21V29/50 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/10] | H05B33/08, A01K29/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/36] | B60Q1/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-BELEUCHTUNG ZUR VIEHZÜCHTUNG | [2012/36] | English: | LED LIGHTING FOR LIVESTOCK DEVELOPMENT | [2012/36] | French: | ÉCLAIRAGE À DEL POUR LE DÉVELOPPEMENT D'ANIMAUX D'ÉLEVAGE | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 11.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 23.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21183165.6 / EP3927120 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2012 | 31.10.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | MT | 15.09.2021 | NL | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | LU | 29.10.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 29.10.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
NL | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/12] | HR | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
BG | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4239020 (KIYOKAWA SHIN [JP], et al); | [Y]US6116190 (KITT LONNIE J [US]); | [Y]US6224243 (KARTON RICHARD L [US]); | [Y]US6766767 (EL HALAWANI MOHAMED E [US], et al); | [X]US2005241593 (KAURA KAMALJIT S [US]); | [A] - "DALI leading and trailing-edge phase dimmers", LUX CONTROL SPEC., (20061211), URL: http://www.tridonic.com/com/en/download/DS_DALI-PCD_300_one4all_en.pdf, (20101220), XP008157513 | by applicant | US6766767 | US2005241593 |