EP2493298 - THE USE OF CI-994 AND DINALINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF MEMORY/COGNITION AND ANXIETY DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | For all designated states The Broad Institute, Inc. 7 Cambridge Center Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation d/b/a Massachusetts General Hospital 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | |||
For all designated states The Broad Institute, Inc. 7 Cambridge Center Cambridge, MA02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAI, Li-Huei 26 Fresh Pond Parkway Cambridge MA 02138 / US | 02 /
GUAN, Ji-Song 28 Ninth Street Apt. 108 Medford MA 02155 / US | 03 /
HAGGARTY, Stephen, J. 320 Savin Hill Avenue, No.4 Dorchester MA 02125 / US | 04 /
HOLSON, Edward 66 Forest Street Newton Highlands MA 02461 / US | 05 /
WAGNER, Florence 4 Old Country Path Ashland MA 01721 / US | 06 /
GRAEFF, Johannes 89 Ridge Road Waban MA 02468 / US | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2012/43] | Wainwright, Jane Helen, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2012/36] | Korn, Richard Mervyn Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10827583.5 | 29.10.2010 | WO2010US54872 | Priority number, date | US20090265468P | 01.12.2009 Original published format: US 265468 P | US20090256927P | 30.10.2009 Original published format: US 256927 P | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011053876 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2493298 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/12, A61K31/195, A61K31/167, A61K45/06, C07C237/42 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | A01N37/12, A61K31/195 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CI-994 UND DINALIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEDÄCHTNIS-/KOGNITIVEN UND ANGSTSTÖRUNGEN | [2012/36] | English: | THE USE OF CI-994 AND DINALINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF MEMORY/COGNITION AND ANXIETY DISORDERS | [2012/36] | French: | UTILISATION DE CI-994 ET DE DINALINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES DE LA MÉMOIRE/COGNITION ET DE L'ANXIÉTÉ | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 14.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1591109 (G2M CANCER DRUGS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8-10 * claims 11,12,32,33 * * page 6, paragraph 33 *; | [XI]WO2007049262 (BERAND LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8-10 * claims 1,11,14 * * page 10, line 8 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 3 * * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 2 * [I] 2,5,7,12-14; | [XP]WO2010065117 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [XP] 1,4,6,8,9 * page 76; figures 12,13; example 5 ** claim 1 *; | [XI] - LANGLEY B ET AL, "REMODELING CHROMATIN AND STRESS RESISTANCE IN THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM: HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS AS NOVEL AND BROADLY EFFECTIVE NEUROPROTECTIVE AGENTS", CURRENT DRUG TARGETS. CNS & NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, HILVERSUM, NL, (20050201), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.2174/1568007053005091, ISSN 1568-007X, pages 41 - 50, XP009048265 [X] 1,4,6,8,9 * page 43, column r, paragraph 2 - page 44, column l * * page 45, column r, paragraph 2 - page 46 * * page 45, column l, paragraph 3 * [I] 2,5,7,12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568007053005091 | [X] - SAMA F SLEIMAN ET AL, "Putting the 'HAT' back on survival signalling: the promises and challenges of HDAC inhibition in the treatment of neurological conditions", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (20090501), vol. 18, no. 5, doi:10.1517/13543780902810345, ISSN 1354-3784, pages 573 - 584, XP055054483 [X] 1,4,6,8,9 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 9 * * page 3, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543780902810345 | [X] - PAUER LYNNE R ET AL, "Phase I study of oral CI-994 in combination with carboplatin and paclitaxel in the treatment of patients with advanced solid tumors", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2004), Database accession no. PREV200500090244, XP002692836 [X] 8-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/CNV-200039852 | [ ] - PAUER LYNNE R ET AL, "Phase I study of oral CI-994 in combination with carboplatin and paclitaxel in the treatment of patients with advanced solid tumors", CANCER INVESTIGATION, (2004), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 0735-7907, pages 886 - 896 | [I] - PRENDERGAST A ET AL, "Treatment with histone deacetylase inhibitors SAHA and MS-275 ameliorates the core symptoms of asocialty and cognitive impairment in an animal model of autism", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER, & 38TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY-FOR-NEUROSCIENCE; WASHINGTON, DC, USA; NOVEMBER 15 -19, 2008, (2008), vol. 38, XP008160443 [I] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2005227929 (MASFERRER JAIME L [US]); | [X]US2007129331 (GATELY STEPHEN [US], et al); | [X]US2007197438 (REISER JOCHEN [US], et al) | by applicant | US5525727 | US5618803 | US6110697 | US6407137 | US2003013176 | US2003082668 | US2003161830 | US2003224473 | US2004091951 | US2005118596 | US2005227300 | US2005288227 | US7119074 | US2007015183 | US2008300205 | - PRENDERGAST ET AL., SOC ETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER, (2008), page 38 | - FRAY ET AL., "CANTAB battery: proposed utility in neurotoxicology.", NEUROTOXICOL TERATOL., (1996), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 499 - 504 | - DEHAENE ET AL., "Reward-dependent learning in neuronal networks for planning and decision making", BRAIN RES., (2000), vol. 126, page 21729 | - IVERSON ET AL., "Interpreting change on the WAIS-III/ WMS-III in clinical samples", ARCH CLIN NEUROPSYCHOL., (2001), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 183 - 91 | - WEAVER ET AL., "Mild memory impairment in healthy older adults is distinct from normal aging.", COGN., (2006), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 146 - 55 | - RICHON ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (2004), vol. 376, pages 199 - 205 | - WEGENER ET AL., MOL GENETMETAB., (2003), vol. 80, no. 1-2, pages 138 - 47 | - ABUCHOWSKI; DAVIS, "Soluble Polymer-Enzyme Adducts", ABUCHOWSKI; DAVIS, HOCENBERG AND ROBERTS, Enzymes as Drugs, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE, (1981), pages 367 - 383 | - NEWMARK ET AL., J. APPL. BIOCHEM., (1982), vol. 4, pages 185 - 189 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - WOOD MA; KAPLAN MP; PARK A; BLANCHARD EJ; OLIVEIRA AM; LOMBARDI TL; ABEL T, "Transgenic mice expressing a truncated form of CREB-binding protein (CBP) exhibit deficits in hippocampal synaptic plasticity and memory storage", LEARN MEM., (200503), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 111 - 9 | - CRUZ JC; TSENG H-C; GOLDMAN JA; SHIH H; TSAI L-H, "Aberrant Cdk5 activation by p25 triggers pathological events leading to neurodegeneration and neurofibrillary tangles", NEURON, (2003), vol. 40, pages 471 - 483 | - FISCHER A; SANANBENESI F; PANG PT; LU B; TSAI L-H, "Opposing roles of transient and prolonged expression of p25 in synaptic plasticity and hippocampus-dependent memory", NEURON, (2005), vol. 48, pages 825 - 838 | - FISCHER A; SANANBENESI F; WANG X; DOBBIN M; TSAI, L-H, "Recovery of learning and memory is associated with chromatin remodeling", NATURE, (2007), vol. 447, pages 178 - 182 | - MONFILS MH; COWANSAGE KK; KLANN E; LEDOUX JE, "Extinction-reconsolidation boundaries: key to persistent attenuation of fear memories", SCIENCE, (20090402), vol. 324, no. 5929, pages 951 - 5 | US20090508481 |