Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8833936 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2014 | B2 | US2012257161 | 11.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 | WO2010AU01486 | 09.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101781232B | Global Dossier | 25.09.2017 | B1 | KR20120115231 | 17.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 | WO2010AU01486 | 09.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5851411B | Global Dossier | 03.02.2016 | B2 | JP2013510331 | 21.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 | WO2010AU01486 | 09.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102713729B | Global Dossier | 27.04.2016 | B | CN102713729 | 03.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 | WO2010AU01486 | 09.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2779675 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2017 | C | CA2779675 | 12.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 | WO2010AU01486 | 09.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010314756B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2013 | B2 | AU2010314756 | 17.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 | AU2010314756 | 09.11.2010 | WO2010AU01486 | 09.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2499536 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2019 | B1 | EP2499536 | 30.11.2016 | A4 | EP2499536 | 19.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 | WO2010AU01486 | 09.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012010883 | 17.11.2020 | B1 | BR112012010883 | 06.03.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 | WO2010AU01486 | 09.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1171265 | 22.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 | WO2010AU01486 | 09.11.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011054058 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY163440 | 15.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | AU2009905468 | 09.11.2009 |