EP2498082 - THIN-FILM REFERENCE PSEUDO-ELECTRODE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centro de Estudios e Investigaciones Tecnicas (CEIT) Paseo de Manuel Lardizabal, 15 20018 San Sebastian (Guipuzcoa) / ES | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AÑORGA GÓMEZ, Larraitz Juan Carlos Guerra 19 - 4[deg] C 20016 San Sebastian (Guipuzcoa) / ES | 02 /
ARANA ALONSO, Sergio José Antonio Loidi Bizkarrondo 17 - 2[deg] A 20304 Irun (Guipuzcoa) / ES | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Mendelsohn, Isabelle M. N., et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2012/37] | Application number, filing date | 10827937.3 | 15.10.2010 | WO2010ES00418 | Priority number, date | ES20090002118 | 05.11.2009 Original published format: ES 200902118 | [2012/37] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011054982 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | ES | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2498082 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 12.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/30, C23C14/34 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
G01N27/301 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (ES);
G01N27/30 (ES)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Title | German: | PSEUDOELEKTRODE MIT DÜNNSCHICHT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/37] | English: | THIN-FILM REFERENCE PSEUDO-ELECTRODE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2012/37] | French: | PSEUDO-ÉLECTRODE DE RÉFÉRENCE DE COUCHE MINCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2012/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2012 | Translation filed | 30.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES | 30.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4933048 | CN101216451 |