EP2497688 - VEHICLE BUMPER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | For all designated states Aisin Keikinzoku Kabushiki Kaisha 12-3 Nagonoe Imizu-shi, Toyama 934-8588 / JP | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANEDA, Shinichi c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
KITA, Kiyoichi c/o AISIN KEIKINZOKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 12-3 Nagonoe Imizu-shi Toyama 934-8588 / JP | 03 /
SHOBO, Jun c/o AISIN KEIKINZOKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 12-3 Nagonoe Imizu-shi Toyama 934-8588 / JP | 04 /
OBAYASHI, Tamaki c/o AISIN KEIKINZOKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 12-3 Nagonoe Imizu-shi Toyama 934-8588 / JP | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10828285.6 | 02.11.2010 | WO2010JP69517 | Priority number, date | JP20090254070 | 05.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009254070 | [2012/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011055725 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2497688 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/04, B60R19/18, B60R19/34 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
B60R19/12 (EP,US);
B60R19/18 (EP,US);
B60R2019/1813 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Title | German: | STOSSFÄNGERANORDNUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2012/37] | English: | VEHICLE BUMPER DEVICE | [2012/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PARE-CHOC POUR VÉHICULE | [2012/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2012 | Translation filed | 20.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 23.07.2012 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 30.07.2012 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 19.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 16.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0144017 (ACCRA TEKNIK AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]US2002053805 (AZUCHI KAZUNARI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5* paragraph [0055]; figures 10a-10d *; | [X]US2005225101 (BLADOW JEFFREY L [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0032]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO2005110638 (ACCRA TEKNIK AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2001260774 (MARUJUN CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004114864 (INOUE MTP KK); | [A]US2006028032 (HENSELEIT KARL [US]); | [Y]JP2006273081 (UNIPRES CORP, et al); | [Y]WO2008051968 (SHAPE CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | US5306058 | JP2846983B | JP2000335333 |