|
30.10.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2019 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2011 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
28 |