08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
30.10.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
28.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
22.11.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
16.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.11.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.11.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.07.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.07.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
02.01.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
16.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.01.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.09.2017 |
First examination report |
|
30.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
05.07.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
11.01.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
30.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
10.08.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
17.04.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|