Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9190070 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2015 | B2 | US2012207326 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009255419 | 06.11.2009 | WO2010JP69869 | 02.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102598127B | Global Dossier | 13.07.2016 | B | CN102598127 | 18.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009255419 | 06.11.2009 | WO2010JP69869 | 02.11.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2498251 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2019 | B1 | EP2498251 | 07.08.2013 | A4 | EP2498251 | 12.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009255419 | 06.11.2009 | WO2010JP69869 | 02.11.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011055829 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009255419 | 06.11.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011100029 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009255419 | 06.11.2009 |