EP2498453 - NODE, MONITORING AND ADMINISTRATION METHOD USED THEREUPON, AND TRANSFER SYSTEM, INPUT CIRCUIT, AND OUTPUT CIRCUIT USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Zhenlong c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
TAKAGI, Hiroyuki c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 03 /
UMAYABASHI, Masaki c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 04 /
TAKAGI, Kazuo c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 05 /
SAKURAI, Akira c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 06 /
TANAKA, Hiroshi c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/41] |
Former [2012/37] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10828395.3 | 02.11.2010 | [2018/41] | WO2010JP69878 | Priority number, date | JP20090253569 | 05.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009253569 | JP20100139696 | 18.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010139696 | [2012/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011055837 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2498453 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2498453 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, // H04L12/939, H04L12/935 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H04L43/0817 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/10 (KR);
H04L45/50 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/286 (EP,KR,US);
H04L49/30 (EP,US);
H04L49/555 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/37] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNOTEN, ÜBERWACHUNGS- UND VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM, EINGANGSSCHALTUNG UND AUSGANGSSCHALTUNG DAMIT | [2012/37] | English: | NODE, MONITORING AND ADMINISTRATION METHOD USED THEREUPON, AND TRANSFER SYSTEM, INPUT CIRCUIT, AND OUTPUT CIRCUIT USING SAME | [2012/37] | French: | NOEUD, DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE/GESTION ASSOCIÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSFERT, CIRCUIT D'ENTRÉE ET CIRCUIT DE SORTIE L'UTILISANT | [2012/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2012 | Translation filed | 01.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 09.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2010 | AL | 10.10.2018 | AT | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | ES | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | HR | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | MK | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | PL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | RS | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | SM | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | IE | 02.11.2018 | LU | 02.11.2018 | MT | 02.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | NO | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | PT | 10.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 02.11.2010 | |
AL | 10.10.2018 | ||
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
MT | 02.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
MT | 02.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
MT | 02.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
IE | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
LU | 02.11.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008225741 (VENKATESWARAN RAJESH TARAKKAD [IN], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0041] *; | [IP]US2010054132 (MITSUMORI YASUYUKI [JP]) [IP] 1-22 * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0143] *; | [A] - GEORGE SWALLOW CISCO SYSTEMS ET AL, "Label Switching Router Self-Test; draft-ietf-mpls-lsr-self-test-06.txt", 5. JCT-VC MEETING; 96. MPEG MEETING; 16-3-2011 - 23-3-2011; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20051001), vol. mpls, no. 6, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015042557 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH07245617 (FUJITSU LTD, et al); | [AP]JP2010056679 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A] - N.BAHADUR ET AL., "LSP-Ping extensions for MPLS-TP", (20091019), XP008156438 | [A] - N.BAHADUR ET AL., "LSP-Ping and BFD encapsulation over ACH", (20091026), XP008155780 | by applicant | - N. BAHADUR; R. AGGARWAL; T. NADEAU; N. SPRECHER; Y. WEINGARTEN, IETF DRAFT, (20090705), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/html/draft-nitinb-mpls-tp-lsp-ping-bfd-procedures-00 |