EP2493442 - DEVICES, METHODS, AND COMPOSITION FOR CONTROLLING INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovation Technologies, Inc. 4510 N.W. 6th Place, Suite A Gainesville, FL 32607 / US | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUCINSKI, Paul, J. c/o Innovation Technologies Inc. 4510 N.W. 6th Place Suite A Gainesville, FL 32607 / US | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Stevens, Fiona Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 10828816.8 | 24.10.2010 | WO2010US53884 | Priority number, date | US20090254906P | 26.10.2009 Original published format: US 254906 P | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011056486 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2493442 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/05, A61K31/35, A61L2/18, A61M35/00, A61P31/00, A61L101/32, A61M25/00, A61M31/00, A61M37/00 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A61K31/35 (EP);
A61M25/00 (EP);
A61M31/00 (EP);
A61M35/003 (EP);
A61M37/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | A61J1/05, A61K31/35, A61L2/18, A61M35/00, A61P31/00, A61L101/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON INFEKTIONEN | [2012/36] | English: | DEVICES, METHODS, AND COMPOSITION FOR CONTROLLING INFECTIONS | [2012/36] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITION PERMETTANT DE LUTTER CONTRE LES INFECTIONS | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 12.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/46] | 11.05.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.09.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/46] | Appeal following examination | 11.07.2017 | Appeal received No. T2051/17 | 01.09.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20090106477 (INNOVATION TECHNOLOGIES INC) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-20 *; | [XY]US2007036846 (TSANG WING W M [HK]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,13 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * examples I, II * * claims 1-6 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2005191247 (DRAKE DAVID [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * page 8, paragraph 104 - paragraphs 1-5 * * examples 1-4 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US6017516 (MODY SHRI SHIRISH BHAGWANLAL [IN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 5, line 4 - line 30 * * column 7; example example * * claims 1-2 * | [XY] - anonymous, "Chlorhexidine andCetrimide IrrigationSolution", Consumer medicine information, (199609), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.betterhealth.vic.gov.au/bhcv2/bhcmed.nsf/ad41b722944269b34a256b4800020946/73f7a5de056f6bcbca257b3600107b78/$FILE/pucchcet.pdf, (20130404), XP002694789 [X] 1,3-9 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [Y]US2004185028 (HU ZHENZE [US], et al); | [Y]US2006051385 (SCHOLZ MATTHEW T [US]); | [X]US6214866 (DROGEMOLLER MONICA LUCIE [ZA], et al) |