EP2493465 - Treatment of sunburn using analgesics and antihistamines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/36] | TREATMENT OF SUNBURN USING ANALGESICS AND ANTIHISTAMINES | ||
[2014/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sephoris Pharmaceuticals, LLC 14895 Highland Heights Road Jamul, California 91935 / US | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEENA, Talal 14895 Highland Heights Road Jamul California 91935 / US | 02 /
ABREO, Melwyn 3373 Armagosa Way Jamul California 91935 / US | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Couchman, Jonathan Hugh, et al HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Couchman, Jonathan Hugh, et al HGF Limited Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2013/29] | Couchman, Jonathan Hugh, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2012/36] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10828865.5 | 26.10.2010 | WO2010US54157 | Priority number, date | US20090254803P | 26.10.2009 Original published format: US 254803 P | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011056604 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2493465 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2493465 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K31/192, A61K31/435, A61K31/4402, A61K31/444, A61K31/495, A61K31/5415, A61K31/554, A61K45/06, A61K31/60, A61K31/425, A61K31/19, A61K31/185, A61P29/00, A61P25/00, A61P17/00, A61P17/02 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/4402 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/435 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/5415 (EP,US);
A61K31/554 (EP,US);
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61J1/035 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/192, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/435, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4402, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/444, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5415, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/554, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2012/36] | A61K31/135, A61K31/192, A61K31/435, A61K31/4402, A61K31/444, A61K31/495, A61K31/5415, A61K31/554, A61K45/06, A61K31/60, A61K31/425, A61K31/19, A61K31/185, A61P29/00, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Behandlung von Sonnenbrand mit Schmerzmitteln und Antihistaminika | [2014/20] | English: | Treatment of sunburn using analgesics and antihistamines | [2014/20] | French: | Traitement de coups de soleil utilisant des analgésiques et des antihistaminiques | [2014/20] |
Former [2012/36] | BEHANDLUNG VON SONNENBRAND MIT SCHMERZMITTELN UND ANTIHISTAMINEN | ||
Former [2012/36] | TREATMENT OF SUNBURN USING ANALGESICS AND ANTIHISTAMINES | ||
Former [2012/36] | TRAITEMENT DE COUPS DE SOLEIL UTILISANT DES ANALGÉSIQUES ET DES ANTIHISTAMINIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 18.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14189568.0 / EP2853262 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2010 | AL | 22.10.2014 | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | CZ | 22.10.2014 | EE | 22.10.2014 | HR | 22.10.2014 | LT | 22.10.2014 | LV | 22.10.2014 | MC | 22.10.2014 | MK | 22.10.2014 | MT | 22.10.2014 | PL | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | RS | 22.10.2014 | SI | 22.10.2014 | SK | 22.10.2014 | SM | 22.10.2014 | TR | 22.10.2014 | LU | 26.10.2014 | NO | 22.01.2015 | IS | 22.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 26.10.2010 | |
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MK | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 26.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 26.10.2010 | |
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LU | 26.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.10.2010 | |
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 22.10.2014 | |
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | HR | 22.10.2014 | |
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RS | 22.10.2014 | ||
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
NO | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 22.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3278379 (LEO MANSOR) [X] 1,4,5,9,10 * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 18 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US5100918 (SUNSHINE ABRAHAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 7, lines 58-64 * * claim 1 *; | [XY]WO9205783 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 12 * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 2 * * page 6, lines 6-9 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 26 * * examples 1, 3 * * claims 1, 3-5, 6 * [Y] 1-15; | [X]US5993833 (DE LACHARRIERE OLIVIER [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-5,15 * example 10 *; | [Y]WO0187236 (KLEIN GERALD L [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1, 2, 7, 8, 10, 11, 13 *; | [X]EP1284151 (RHODES DONALD A [US]) [X] 1-5,9,15 * example 9 * * column 7, paragraph [0024] * * claims 1, 8, 9, 11 *; | [X]WO2005009342 (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,11 * page 6, paragraph [00022] * * page 14, paragraph [00058] * * page 130, paragraph [000175] * * page 137, paragraph [000214] * * page 138, paragraph [000217] * * table 4; compounds A26, A36, A37, A48 * * page 158, paragraphs [000230]-[000231] * * page 160, paragraph [000239] * * pages 187-188, paragraph [000333] * * claims 1, 2, 4, 7, 9, 10 *; | [XA]WO2005079272 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [X] 12,13 * page 2, lines 24-29 * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 17 * * page 7, lines 1-28 * * page 8, lines 19-23 * * example 1 * * claims 9, 14, 15 * [A] 1-11; | [XP]WO2009145921 (FAIRFIELD CLINICAL TRIALS LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,9,11,15 * page 3, paragraph [0007] - page 4, paragraph [0010] * * page 12, paragraph [0029] * * pages 13-14, paragraph [0032] ** claims 1-3, 10, 11, 19-21 *; | [XY] - JENS-UWE GRUNDMANN ET AL, "UV Erythema Reducing Capacity of Mizolastine Compared to Acetyl-salicylic Acid or both Combined in Comparison to Indomethacin+", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, (20011001), vol. 74, no. 4, doi:10.1562/0031-8655(2001)0740587UERCOM2.0.CO2, ISSN 0031-8655, pages 587 - 592, XP055032598 [X] 1,3,4,6,10,11,15 * abstract * * page 588, column 1, paragraph 5 * * page 588, column 2, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-3 * * page 589, column 1, paragraph 6 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 590, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 591, column 1, paragraphs 2-3 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1562/0031-8655(2001)0740587UERCOM2.0.CO2 | [X] - NAKASHIMA M ET AL, "Antihistaminic and anti-inflammatory effects of Epiamart[rho] S by topical application", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), Database accession no. EMB-1997296761, XP002679915 [X] 1,3-5,11,15 * abstract * | [ ] - NAKASHIMA M ET AL, "Antihistaminic and anti-inflammatory effects of Epiamart[rho] S by topical application", JAPANESE PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS 1996 JP, (1996), vol. 24, no. 10, ISSN 0386-3603, pages 91 - 95 | International search | [A]US5100918 (SUNSHINE ABRAHAM [US], et al); | [A]WO9945921 (OLDFIELD FAMILY HOLDINGS PTY L [AU], et al); | [A]US2003129209 (WALCH HATTO [DE]); | [X]US2007014757 (CHAUHAN ABHAY S [IN], et al); | [A]US2009196840 (LORENZO ANGELA L [US]) | Examination | - HAN AMY ET AL, "Management of acute sunburn.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL DERMATOLOGY 2004, (2004), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1175-0561, pages 39 - 47 | - IKAI K ET AL, "EAR SWELLING IN RESPONSE TO UV-B IRRADIATION", ARCHIVES OF DERMATOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 278, no. 6, ISSN 0340-3696, pages 445 - 448 | - AKTER U ET AL, "Effects of several agents on UVB- and UVA plus systemic fluoroquinolone-induced erythema of guinea pig skin evaluated by reflectance colorimetry.", FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY & MEDICINE MAY 1998, (199805), vol. 24, no. 7-8, ISSN 0891-5849, pages 1113 - 1119 | - EDWARDS E K JR ET AL, "The effect of antihistamines on ultraviolet-light-induced erythema.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY NOV 1983, (198311), vol. 22, no. 9, ISSN 0011-9059, pages 540 - 541 | by applicant | US4861760 | US4911920 | US5212162 | US5403841 |