EP2499494 - REAGENTS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING PNH TYPE II WHITE BLOOD CELLS AND THEIR IDENTIFICATION AS RISK FACTORS FOR THROMBOTIC DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alexion Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 100 College Street New Haven, CT 06510 / US | [2017/10] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states ALEXION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 352 Knotter Drive Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOVALIA, Mayur 21 Rosebud Lane Brewer, ME 04412 / US | 02 /
ILLINGWORTH, Andrea 150 Eaton Ridge Holden, ME 04429 / US | 03 /
FAAS MCKNIGHT, Susan 14 Stonewood Drive Old Lyme, CT 06371 / US | 04 /
ROTHER, Russell, P. 10325 Forest Meadow Drive Oklahoma City, OK 73151 / US | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/38] | Dempster, Robert Charles D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10829274.9 | 09.11.2010 | [2017/10] | WO2010US55997 | Priority number, date | US20090280897P | 09.11.2009 Original published format: US 280897 P | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057250 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2499494 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2499494 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/577, G01N33/53, G01N33/50, G01N33/68 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
G01N33/50 (KR);
G01N33/5094 (US);
A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K31/727 (EP,US);
A61K35/19 (US);
A61K38/196 (EP,US);
A61K38/4886 (EP,US);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07K16/40 (US);
C12Q1/02 (KR);
G01N33/56972 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (KR);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | 06.06.2012 | ME | 06.06.2012 | Title | German: | REAGENZIEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON PNH-TYP-II-LEUKOZYTEN UND IHRE IDENTIFIZIERUNG ALS RISIKOFAKTOREN FÜR THROMBOTISCHE ERKRANKUNGEN | [2012/38] | English: | REAGENTS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING PNH TYPE II WHITE BLOOD CELLS AND THEIR IDENTIFICATION AS RISK FACTORS FOR THROMBOTIC DISORDERS | [2012/38] | French: | RÉACTIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À DÉTECTER DES GLOBULES BLANCS ASSOCIÉS À UNE HPN DE TYPE II ET LEUR IDENTIFICATION COMME FACTEURS DE RISQUE POUR DES TROUBLES THROMBOTIQUES | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.11.2010 | AL | 08.03.2017 | AT | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | DK | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | MK | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | RS | 08.03.2017 | SE | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | SM | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | NO | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | IE | 09.11.2017 | LU | 09.11.2017 | MT | 09.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.11.2010 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.11.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
MT | 09.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 09.11.2010 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.11.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
MT | 09.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.11.2010 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.11.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
MT | 09.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.11.2010 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.11.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
MT | 09.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.11.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
MT | 09.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 09.11.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
MT | 09.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
MT | 09.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
LU | 09.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 08.03.2017 | |
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - D. ROBERT SUTHERLAND ET AL, "Diagnosing PNH with FLAER and multiparameter flow cytometry", CYTOMETRY PART B: CLINICAL CYTOMETRY, (20070501), vol. 72B, no. 3, doi:10.1002/cyto.b.20151, ISSN 1552-4949, pages 167 - 177, XP055064574 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.b.20151 | [A] - HALL CLAIRE ET AL, "Primary prophylaxis with warfarin prevents thrombosis in paroxysmal nocturnal hemoglobinuria (PNH)", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20031115), vol. 102, no. 10, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2003-01-0009, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3587 - 3591, XP002482083 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-01-0009 | International search | [X]US6593095 (BUCKLEY J THOMAS [CA], et al); | [A]US2007116710 (BELL LEONARD [US], et al); | [X] - RICHARDS, S. J. ET AL., "Application of Flow Cytometry to the Diagnosis of Paroxysmal Nocturnal Hemoglobinuria", CYTOMETRY, (2000), vol. 42, pages 223 - 233, XP008153703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0320(20000815)42:4<223::AID-CYTO2>3.0.CO;2-D | [X] - DWORACKI, G. ET AL., "Flow cytometric analysis of CD55 and CD59 expression on blood cells in paroxysmal nocturnal haemoglobinuria", FOLIA HISTOCHEMICA ET CYTOBIOLOGICA, (2005), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 117 - 120, XP008153705 | [X] - BRODKSY, R. A. ET AL., "Improved Detection and Characterization of Paroxysmal Nocturnal Hemoglobinuria Using Fluorescent Aerolysin", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY, (2000), vol. 114, pages 459 - 466, XP008153663 | [XP] - MOVALIA, M. K. ET AL., "Identification and Clinical Significance of Type II Granulocytes Among Patients with Paroxysmal Nocturnal Hemoglobinuria (PNH) Identified Using Multiparameter High-Sensitivity Flow Cytometry.", Blood (ASHAnnual Meeting Abstracts), (2009), page 114, XP008153390 | [A] - HALL, C. ET AL., "Primary prophylaxis with warfarin prevents thrombosis in paroxysmal nocturnal hemoglobinuria (PNH)", BLOOD, (2003), vol. 102, pages 3587 - 3591, XP002482083 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-01-0009 | [A] - HILL, A. ET AL., "The Incidence and Prevalence of Paroxysmal Nocturnal Hemoglobinuria (PNH) and Survival of Patients in Yorkshire", Blood (ASHAnnual Meeting.Abstracts), (2006), page 108, XP008153661 | [A] - MOYO, V. M. ET AL., "Natural history of paroxysmal nocturnal haemoglobinuria using modern diagnostic assays", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (2004), vol. 126, pages 133 - 138, XP008153402 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.2004.04992.x | by applicant | US4816567 | WO9203918 | WO9222645 | WO9222647 | WO9222670 | WO9312227 | WO9400569 | WO9425585 | WO9614436 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5591669 | US5612205 | WO9713852 | US5625825 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5643763 | US5661016 | EP0546073 | US5721367 | WO9824884 | US5770429 | US5789650 | US5789215 | US5814318 | US5874299 | US5877397 | WO0034317 | US6255458 | US6300129 | US6593095 | WO2004108158 | US7041871 | US2007116710 | - ROSSE, MEDICINE, (1997), vol. 76, pages 63 - 93 | - NICHOLSON-WELLER ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 5066 - 5070 | - YAMASHINA ET AL., NENGL J MED, (1990), vol. 323, pages 1184 - 1189 | - SUTHERLAND ET AL., AM J CLIN PATHOL, (2009), vol. 132, pages 564 - 572 | - BRODSKY ET AL., AM J CLIN PATHOL, (2000), vol. 114, pages 459 - 466 | - RICHARDS ET AL., CYTOMETRY, (20000815), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 223 - 33 | - HALL ET AL., BLOOD, (20031115), vol. 102, no. 10, pages 3587 - 91 | - HILL ET AL., BLOOD (ASH ANNUAL MEETING ABSTRACTS, (2006), page 108 | - MOYO ET AL., BR J HAEMATOL., (200407), vol. 126, no. 1, pages 133 - 8 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - STAELENS ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 43, pages 1243 - 1257 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. CAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGEMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 7, page 33 | - DUCHOSAL ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 355, page 258 | - TAYLOR ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, page 6287 | - CHEN ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 5, page 647 | - TUAILLON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 3720 - 4 | - CHOI ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1993), vol. 4, page 117 | - LONBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 856 - 859 | - TAYLOR ET AL., INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 6, pages 579 - 591 | - TUAILLON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, pages 6453 - 65 | - FISHWILD ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, page 845 | - TUAILLON ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 10, pages 2998 - 3005 |