EP2499354 - HYDRAULIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CETO IP Pty Ltd 21 Barker Street Belmont, 6104 / AU | [2018/40] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states CETO IP Pty Ltd Level 1 16 Ord Street West Perth Western Australia 6005 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, Greg John 8 Stratford Street East Fremantle Western Australia 6158 / AU | 02 /
CALJOUW, Ruud 51 Churchill Avenue Subiaco Western Australia 6008 / AU | 03 /
FIEVEZ, Jonathan Pierre 18 Olding Street Melville Western Australia 6156 / AU | 04 /
KESSEL, David 46B Ramsdale Street Doubleview Western Australia 6018 / AU | 05 /
LAXTON, Nigel 31 The Boulevard Mount Hawthorn Western Australia 6016 / AU | 06 /
MANN, Laurence Drew 19 Bradhurst Crescent Bateman Western Australia 6150 / AU | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Hendry, Niall James Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10829375.4 | 15.11.2010 | WO2010AU01530 | Priority number, date | AU20090905560 | 13.11.2009 Original published format: AU 2009905560 | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057358 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2499354 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/14, F03B13/26, F03B15/00, F03B13/18 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
F03B13/189 (EP,KR,US);
F03B17/005 (KR);
F05B2240/40 (EP,KR,US);
F05B2240/95 (KR);
F05B2260/406 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/30 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | F03B13/14, F03B13/26, F03B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | HYDRAULIKVORRICHTUNG | [2012/38] | English: | HYDRAULIC APPARATUS | [2012/38] | French: | APPAREIL HYDRAULIQUE | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 21.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 28.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/18] | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4204406 (HOPFE HAROLD H [US]) [Y] 1-16,21-23 * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 58 * * figures 1,3,5 *; | [XY]US4781023 (GORDON CARROLL K [US]) [X] 17-20 * column 15, line 25 - column 21, line 46 * * figures 1,8-11 * [Y] 1-16,21-23; | [A]US5179837 (SIEBER J D [CA]) [A] 1-23* abstract *; | [A]US2009146429 (PROTTER NIGEL PETER WEBB [CA], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0038] , [0058] - [0064] * * figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]US4204406 (HOPFE HAROLD H [US]); | [X]US4208878 (RAINEY DON E [US]); | [X]US5179837 (SIEBER J D [CA]); | [X]US2003019207 (PARKER DAVID JOSEPH [US]); | [X]US2005084333 (ZADIG STEPHEN J [US]); | [X]US7042112 (WOOD CHARLES [CA]) |